This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 08:02:45 (UTC).

In re: PG&E Corporation and Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 In re PG E Corporation and Pacific Gas and Electric Company was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-02633

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Appellants

PG&E Corporation

Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Appellee

DRRT

Not Classified By Court

Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors

Official Committee of Tort Claimants

Interested Party

Senior Vice Presiden Jason P. Wells

San Francisco, CA 94177

Trustee

Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF

450 Golden Gate Ave, 5Th Fl, #05-0153

San Francisco, CA 94102

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Andriana Georgallas

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Bradley Robert Schneider

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 S. Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Dara Levinson Silveira

Attorney at Keller and Benvenutti LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

David A. Herman

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

David Levine

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw #1200

Washington, DC 20006

Jane Kim

Attorney at Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP

650 California Street, Suite 1900

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jared R Friedmann

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Jessica Liou

Attorney at WEIL, GOTSHAL & MANGES LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153-0119

John Nolan

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New Yor, NY 10153

Katherine B Kohn

Attorney at Groom Law Group, Chartered

1701 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kevin Bostel

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Kevin Kramer

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Kevin J. Orsini

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine and Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Lee Brand

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew Goren

Attorney at WEIL, GOTSHAL & MANGES LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153-0119

Omid H. Nasab

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Paul H. Zumbro

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine and Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Peter J. Benvenutti

Attorney at Keller & Benvenutti LLP

650 California St., 19Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Ray C. Schrock

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Richard W. Slack

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal and Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153-0119

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Cou

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Court Certificate of Mailing

1 #4

USBC Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Docket Sheet

3 #2

certificate of record

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Appendix Volume I of I

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Reorganized Debtors' Opening Brief on Appeal. Appellee Brief due by 7/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I of I)(Rupp, Thomas) (Filed on 6/24/2022) Modified on 6/27/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECEIPT OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL in PDF Format: Record on Appeal Received and Attached at the Request of the Court re appeal #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, : (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 certificate of record)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2022) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-30088-DM. File received. Filed byPG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to Have Appeal Heard by District Court, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Court Certificate of Mailing, #4 USBC Docket Sheet)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PG&E CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dara Levinson Silveira

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Omid H. Nasab