This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2022 at 09:26:17 (UTC).

In Re: Ozempic (Semaglutide) Patent Litigation

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 In Re Ozempic Semaglutide Patent Litigation was filed as an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-MD-03038

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

Zydus Lifesciences Limited

Ozempic (Semaglutide) Patent Litigation

Novo Nordisk Inc.

Novo Nordisk A/S

Rio Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.

EMS S/A

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Inc.

Clerk of MDL Panel

Thurgood Marshall Federal Judiciary Building, One Columbus Circle, Ne

Washington, DC 20544-0005

Zydus Worldwide DMCC

Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc.

Cadila Healthcare Ltd.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd.

Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc.

Alvogen, Inc.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Pilar Gabrielle Kraman

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

August M. Melcher

Carolyn A. Blessing

David B. Abramowitz

Jacob C. Britz

Michael J. Gaertner

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Travis J Murray

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht and Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

Brian P. Egan

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Kelly E. Farnan

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher B. Ferenc

Christopher W. West

Dominick T. Gattuso

Attorney at Heyman Enerio Gattuso & Hirzel LLP

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alison M. King

Jovial Wong

Sharon Lin

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Chantelle D. Ankerman

Emily DiBenedetto

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 N Market St, Ste 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Exhibit A-J

25 #25

Main Document

#24

(#24) ORDER granting ((23) in case 1:22-md-03038-CFC, (61) in case 1:22-cv-00294-CFC) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Against Zydus (Unopposed). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/29/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03038-CFC, 1:22-cv-00294-CFC(kmd) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

23 #3

Ex. 2 - Redline

23 #2

Exhibits A-J to First Amended Complaint

23 #1

Ex. 1 - First Amended Complaint

23 #23

Main Document

#22

(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-88) Directed to Defendant Alvogen, Inc., (2) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-94) Directed to Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., (3) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-92) Directed to Defendants Rio Biopharmaceuticals Inc. and EMS S/A, (4) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-76) Directed to Defendants Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., and (5) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-73) Directed to Defendants Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., and Zydus Lifesciences Limited - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Murray, Travis) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-162) Directed to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Murray, Travis) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aziz Burgy - filed by Alvogen, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., and Zydus Lifesciences Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) filed by Zydus Lifesciences Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC.(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Murray, Travis) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE of DRL's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) Directed to DRL filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Rio Biopharmaceuticals Inc. and EMS S/A's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-10) filed by EMS S/A, Rio Biopharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

#2

(#2) Letter to Clerk, USDC/NDWV from Clerk, USDC/DE, dated 08/05/2022, regarding transfer of Civil Action to Delaware. (smg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#1

(#1) CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER - issued by the Panel on Multi-District Litigation on 08/05/2022 - Associated DE Cases: CA 22-cv-294-CFC, CA 22-cv-296-CFC, CA 22-cv-297-CFC, CA 22-cv-298-CFC, CA 22-cv-299-CFC. (smg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#36

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Egan on behalf of Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Zydus Lifesciences Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC- filed by Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk A/S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-J)(kmd) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting ((23) in case 1:22-md-03038-CFC, (61) in case 1:22-cv-00294-CFC) Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Against Zydus (Unopposed). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/29/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03038-CFC, 1:22-cv-00294-CFC(kmd) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Against Zydus (Unopposed) - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits A-J to First Amended Complaint, #3 Ex. 2 - Redline)(Egan, Brian) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Aziz Burgy for Alvogen, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03038-CFC, 1:22-cv-00294-CFC(mpb) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-88) Directed to Defendant Alvogen, Inc., (2) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-94) Directed to Defendants Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Ltd. and Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., (3) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-92) Directed to Defendants Rio Biopharmaceuticals Inc. and EMS S/A, (4) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-76) Directed to Defendants Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., and (5) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-73) Directed to Defendants Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., and Zydus Lifesciences Limited - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Murray, Travis) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 11-162) Directed to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Murray, Travis) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (59 in 1:22-cv-00294-CFC, 20 in 1:22-md-03038-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aziz Burgy, filed by Alvogen, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/27/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00294-CFC, 1:22-md-03038-CFC(kmd) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Aziz Burgy - filed by Alvogen, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Collective Interrogatories to Defendants (Nos. 1-12) - filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Murray, Travis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Zydus Worldwide DMCC, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., and Zydus Lifesciences Limited's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) filed by Zydus Lifesciences Limited, Zydus Pharmaceuticals (USA) Inc., Zydus Worldwide DMCC.(Kraman, Pilar) (Entered: 08/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) filed by Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc..(Murray, Travis) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE of DRL's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' First Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-10) Directed to DRL filed by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories Ltd..(Gattuso, Dominick) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Rio Biopharmaceuticals Inc. and EMS S/A's responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-10) filed by EMS S/A, Rio Biopharmaceuticals, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Egan on behalf of Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk Inc. (Egan, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Clerk, USDC/NDWV from Clerk, USDC/DE, dated 08/05/2022, regarding transfer of Civil Action to Delaware. (smg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketThe following cases in the District of Delaware are included in this MDL: 1:22-cv-00294-CFC, 1:22-cv-00296-CFC, 1:22-cv-00297-CFC, 1:22-cv-00298-CFC, 1:22-cv-00299-CFC. (smg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03038-CFC, 1:22-cv-00294-CFC, 1:22-cv-00296-CFC, 1:22-cv-00297-CFC, 1:22-cv-00298-CFC, 1:22-cv-00299-CFC.(smg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:2022-md-3038 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Colm F. Connolly. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may request E-Filing rights through PACER and add the MDL case number in the comments section of your request. Please see the docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:22-md-03038-CFC et al.(smg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER - issued by the Panel on Multi-District Litigation on 08/05/2022 - Associated DE Cases: CA 22-cv-294-CFC, CA 22-cv-296-CFC, CA 22-cv-297-CFC, CA 22-cv-298-CFC, CA 22-cv-299-CFC. (smg) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clerk of MDL Panel is a litigant

Latest cases where Alvogen Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVO NORDISK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cadila Healthcare Ltd. is a litigant