This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 19:53:50 (UTC).

IN RE OPKO HEALTH, INC. SECURITIES LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 IN RE OPKO HEALTH, INC SECURITIES LITIGATION was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Lawrence King and Jose E. Martinez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-20502

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

James Lawrence King

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Kerznowski

Defendants

JUAN F. RODRIGUEZ

OPKO Health, Inc.

Erste Asset Management GmbH

Phillip Frost

Adam Logal

AMIDEX Funds, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laurence Matthew Rosen

Attorney at The Rosen Law Firm

275 Madison Avenue, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Brian Paul Miller

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Three Brickell City Centre, 98 Southeast Seventh Street

Miami, FL 33131

Benjamin Reid Joelson

Attorney at Akerman LLP

666 Fifth Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10103

Samantha J. Kavanaugh

Attorney at Akerman LLP

Three Brickell City Centre, 98 Southeast Seventh Street

Miami, FL 33131

Michael Thomas Gray Long

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler PC

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

John A. Macoretta

Attorney at Spector Roseman Kodroff PC

2001 Market Street, Suite 3420

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#76

(#76) ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-23786-JEM, 1:19-cv-20003-JEM, 1:19-cv-20502-JEM (pcs) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

75 #1

Text of Proposed Order proposed Order

#75

(#75) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #74 Amended Complaint and Joint Motion for an Order Establishing Briefing Schedule by OPKO Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Miller, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#74

(#74) AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Phillip Frost, OPKO Health, Inc., filed by Amitim Funds.(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

73 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#73

(#73) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ryan Dykhouse. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11611350 by Amitim Funds. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

72 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#72

(#72) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jai Chandrasekhar. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11611316 by Amitim Funds. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#71

(#71) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brenna Nelinson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11611272 by Amitim Funds. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

5 #8

Text of Proposed Order

5 #3

Exhibit A - Cohen and Davis Certifications

#5

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LEWIS COHEN, ROBERT J. DAVIS re #5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Their Selection of Counsel (ROSEN, MARK) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHILLIP FROST, ADAM LOGAL, OPKO HEALTH, INC., JUAN F. RODRIGUEZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JASON KERZNOWSKI. (ROSEN, LAURENCE) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#2

(#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by JASON KERZNOWSKI as to PHILLIP FROST, ADAM LOGAL, OPKO HEALTH, INC., JUAN F. RODRIGUEZ. (ROSEN, LAURENCE) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

PSLRA Certification

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PHILLIP FROST, ADAM LOGAL, OPKO HEALTH, INC., JUAN F. RODRIGUEZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9019765) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JASON KERZNOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated per order DE76 Closing Case. (pcs) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/8/2019. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-23786-JEM, 1:19-cv-20003-JEM, 1:19-cv-20502-JEM (pcs) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Cases associated. (pcs) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #74 Amended Complaint and Joint Motion for an Order Establishing Briefing Schedule by OPKO Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Miller, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Phillip Frost, OPKO Health, Inc., filed by Amitim Funds.(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#73) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ryan Dykhouse. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11611350 by Amitim Funds. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jai Chandrasekhar. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11611316 by Amitim Funds. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brenna Nelinson. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11611272 by Amitim Funds. Responses due by 5/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#70) ORDER OF TRANSFERRING to Judge Jose E. Martinez for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/11/2019. Senior Judge James Lawrence King no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) ORDER granting #68 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant OPKO Health Inc. Benjamin Reid Joelson withdrawn from case Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Benjamin Joelson.. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 03/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel by STEVEN WESTON, WESTON FAMILY PARTNERSHIP, LLLP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of David A. Bocian in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A - Certifications, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C- Notice of Pendency, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Resume, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(BOCIAN, DAVID) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Amidex Funds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(MACORETTA, JOHN) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff - John Kleiss, MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Attorney: Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP. by John Kleiss. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(KAMIN, CORREY) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LEWIS COHEN, ROBERT J. DAVIS re #5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Their Selection of Counsel (ROSEN, MARK) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Their Selection of Counsel by LEWIS COHEN, ROBERT J. DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A - Cohen and Davis Certifications, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #5 Exhibit C - Notice, #6 Exhibit D - Firm Biography, #7 Exhibit E - Joint Declarations, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(ROSEN, MARK) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHILLIP FROST, ADAM LOGAL, OPKO HEALTH, INC., JUAN F. RODRIGUEZ. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JASON KERZNOWSKI. (ROSEN, LAURENCE) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by JASON KERZNOWSKI as to PHILLIP FROST, ADAM LOGAL, OPKO HEALTH, INC., JUAN F. RODRIGUEZ. (ROSEN, LAURENCE) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PHILLIP FROST, ADAM LOGAL, OPKO HEALTH, INC., JUAN F. RODRIGUEZ ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9019765) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JASON KERZNOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.