This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2020 at 09:31:43 (UTC).

In re: NNN 400 CAPITOL CENTER 16, LLC, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 In re NNN 400 CAPITOL CENTER 16, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01262

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Appellant

Rubin & Rubin, P.A.

Debtor

NNN 400 CAPITOL CENTER 16, LLC, et al.

Appellees

Somera Road Inc.

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Office of the United States Trustee

LNR Partners, LLC

Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC

Taconic Capital Advisors, LP

SomeraRoad Inc.

Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Michael Louis Vild

Attorney at Cross & Simon, LLC

1105 North Market Street, Suite 901

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher Page Simon

Attorney at Cross & Simon, LLC

1105 North Market Street, Suite 901

Wilmington, DE 19801

Julia Bettina Klein

Attorney at Klein LLC

225 West 14Th St, Wilmington

Wilmington, DE 19801-1114

Appellee Attorneys

Brett D. Fallon

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Ave., Ste 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sommer L. Ross

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1600

Wilmington, DE 19801-1659

Benjamin A. Hackman

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

844 N. King Street, Suite 2207

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#22

#20

#18

#17

15 #2

Certificate of Service

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

#5

#21

#19

#17

#3

#2

1 #2

Order on appeal

1 #1

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

#1

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER Withdrawing the Bankruptcy Appeal from Mediation; ORDER setting briefing schedule: ( Appellant Brief due by 12/7/2020., Appellee Brief due by 1/8/2021., Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/25/2021.) in case 1:20-cv-01260-CFC; 1:20-cv-01261-CFC; 1:20-cv-01262-CFC; 1:20-cv-01266-CFC; 1:20-cv-01267-CFC; re: (17) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01260-CFC; re (19) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01262-CFC; re (18) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01261-CFC; re (17) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01266-CFC; re (17) Recommendation in case 1:20-cv-01267-CFC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion of Christopher P. Simon, Michael L. Vild and Cross & Simon, LLC for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Rubin & Rubin, P.A. and Rubin Law Associates P.A. by Rubin & Rubin, P.A. re #15 MOTION for Christopher P. Simon, Michael L. Vild and Cross & Simon, LLC to Withdraw as Attorney (Simon, Christopher) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Rubin Law Associates, P.A., Rubin & Rubin, P.A.: Entry of appearance of attorney Julia Bettina Klein. Attorney Christopher P. Simon, Michael L. Vild and the Law Firm of Cross & Simon LLC terminated. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION for Christopher P. Simon, Michael L. Vild and Cross & Simon, LLC to Withdraw as Attorney Lender Appellees' Limited Objection to Motion of Christopher P. Simon, Michael L. Vild and Cross & Simon, LLC for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for Rubin & Rubin, P.A. and Rubin Law Associates, P.A. filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/22/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC(cak) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Lender Appellees' Counter-Record Designations (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by SomeraRoad Inc. Appellee SomeraRoad Inc.'s Designation of Additional Items for Inclusion in Record for Appeal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Office of the United States Trustee (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Counterdesignations)(Hackman, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (11 in 1:20-cv-01266-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul E. Chronis filed by Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (10 in 1:20-cv-01260-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meagen E. Leary filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (12 in 1:20-cv-01267-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elinor H. Murarova filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (10 in 1:20-cv-01266-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meagen E. Leary filed by Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (13 in 1:20-cv-01262-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul E. Chronis filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (12 in 1:20-cv-01262-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meagen E. Leary filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (12 in 1:20-cv-01261-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul E. Chronis filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (12 in 1:20-cv-01266-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elinor H. Murarova filed by Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (11 in 1:20-cv-01267-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul E. Chronis filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (13 in 1:20-cv-01261-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elinor H. Murarova filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (11 in 1:20-cv-01260-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul E. Chronis filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (14 in 1:20-cv-01262-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elinor H. Murarova filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (12 in 1:20-cv-01260-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Elinor H. Murarova filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (11 in 1:20-cv-01261-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meagen E. Leary filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, (10 in 1:20-cv-01267-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Meagen E. Leary filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Christopher P. Simon, Michael L. Vild and Cross & Simon, LLC to Withdraw as Attorney - filed by Rubin & Rubin, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Simon, Christopher) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Rubin & Rubin, P.A. //Appellant Rubin & Rubin, P.A.'s Record Designation and Statement of Issues on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Simon, Christopher) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Remark: D.I. #1 Notice of Appeal replaced on 9/25/2020 per attached updated Bankruptcy Court Transmittal. (amf) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, October 8, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/24/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC(cak) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01260-CFC, 1:20-cv-01261-CFC, 1:20-cv-01262-CFC, 1:20-cv-01266-CFC, 1:20-cv-01267-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended Transmittal of Record on Appeal to District Court. by Rubin & Rubin, P.A. Amendment to D.I. 1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark: Rubin Law Associates, P.A. removed as party per D.I. #3 (sam) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (sam) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (sam) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on September 4, 2020 by Judge Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 16-12728. Fee Status Paid.- filed by Rubin & Rubin, P.A., Rubin Law Associates, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Order on appeal)(sam) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/25/2020) (amf). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC is a litigant