This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:16:11 (UTC).

In re: NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 In re NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01082

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Debtor and Appellant

NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC

Appellees

LNR Partners, LLC

Wells Fargo Bank N.A.

Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC

Somera Road, Inc.

Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust

Taconic Capital Advisors, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Thomas Joseph Francella, Jr.

Attorney at Cozen & O'Connor

1201 North Market St., Suite 1001

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Lawrence Joel Kotler

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1600

Wilmington, DE 19801-1659

Sommer L. Ross

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1600

Wilmington, DE 19801-1659

Brett D. Fallon

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Ave., Ste 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801

Carl N. Kunz, III

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

Sarah Michelle Ennis

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Appellee, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust regarding Motion to Remand - re #5 MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Notice of Sealed Multi-Media Materials Submitted to the Clerk of the Court in Connection with Lender Appellees and Cross-Appellants Record Designations. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Sommer L. Ross on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Notice of Public Multi-Media Materials Submitted to the Clerk of the Court in Connection with Lender Appellees and Cross-Appellants Record Designations. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Sommer L. Ross on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#15

(#15) EXHIBIT re #14 Statement of Issues on Appeal, Appellee Somera Road Inc.'s Counter-Designation of Record for Appeal by Somera Road, Inc.. (Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#14

(#14) STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Cross-Appellant's Statement of Issues on Cross-Appeal and Lender Appellees' and Cross-Appellant's Record Designations (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Cross Appeal by Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#5

(#18) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Appellee, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust regarding Motion to Remand - re #5 MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand, granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand, granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust. ORDER Remanding Case to the District of Delaware Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #3

Finding of Facts and Conclusion of Law

1 #2

Final Judgment on Appeal

1 #1

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 08/10/2020 by John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 18-50384-JTD. Fee Status Paid.- filed by NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Final Judgment on Appeal, #3 Finding of Facts and Conclusion of Law)(apk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED per Order granting Motion to Remand to the Bankruptcy Court. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand, granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand, granting (5 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand filed by Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust. ORDER Remanding Case to the District of Delaware Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Flash Drive. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brett D. Fallon on behalf of Somera Road, Inc. (Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Appellee, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust regarding Motion to Remand - re #5 MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#21) [SEALED] MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in the form of a flash drive. Filing related to (17 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (17 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (17 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#19) MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., LNR Partners, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in the form of a flash drive. Filing related to (16 in 1:20-cv-01082-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (16 in 1:20-cv-01081-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials, (16 in 1:20-cv-01080-CFC) Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC(nmf) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Notice of Sealed Multi-Media Materials Submitted to the Clerk of the Court in Connection with Lender Appellees and Cross-Appellants Record Designations. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Sommer L. Ross on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: Notice of Public Multi-Media Materials Submitted to the Clerk of the Court in Connection with Lender Appellees and Cross-Appellants Record Designations. Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Sommer L. Ross on behalf of Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXHIBIT re #14 Statement of Issues on Appeal, Appellee Somera Road Inc.'s Counter-Designation of Record for Appeal by Somera Road, Inc.. (Fallon, Brett) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATEMENT OF ISSUES on Appeal filed by Berkadia Commercial Mortgage, LLC, LNR Partners, LLC, Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust, Taconic Capital Advisors, LP, Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Cross-Appellant's Statement of Issues on Cross-Appeal and Lender Appellees' and Cross-Appellant's Record Designations (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Cross Appeal by Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC and Statement of Issues (Francella, Thomas) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Motion to Remand - filed by Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT Little Rock-400 West Capitol Trust's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Little Rock-400 West Capital Trust. (Ross, Sommer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-CFC, 1:20-cv-01081-CFC, 1:20-cv-01082-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Thursday, September 10, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/20/20. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01080-UNA, 1:20-cv-01081-UNA, 1:20-cv-01082-UNA(cak) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (apk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/19/2020) (apk). (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/20/2020) (apk). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (apk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (apk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 08/10/2020 by John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 18-50384-JTD. Fee Status Paid.- filed by NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Final Judgment on Appeal, #3 Finding of Facts and Conclusion of Law)(apk) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NNN 400 Capital Center 16, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKADIA COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE INC. is a litigant