This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:12:09 (UTC).

In Re: Motion to Quash Subpoenas Directed to Citrix Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Other case was filed by In Re Motion to Quash Subpoenas Directed to Citrix Systems, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Delaware District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-MC-00206

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cisco Systems, Inc.

Respondent

Citrix Systems, Inc.

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit A-F

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION to Quash - filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Opening Brief, #2 Exhibit A-F, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miscellaneous Filing Fee $47 paid. Rec#0311-2715693)(sam) Modified on 8/26/2019 (sam). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #1

Opening Brief

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cisco's motion to quash (D.I. #1 ) is DENIED without prejudice to re-file according to the discovery dispute procedures set forth at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Stark, New Procedures). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/28/19. (ntl) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 2 removed. Filed in error. (sam) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Remark: Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (sam) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Quash - filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Opening Brief, #2 Exhibit A-F, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miscellaneous Filing Fee $47 paid. Rec#0311-2715693)(sam) Modified on 8/26/2019 (sam). (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.