This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:51:47 (UTC).

In re: McKinsey & Co., Inc. National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 In re McKinsey Co , Inc National Prescription Opiate Consultant Litigation was filed as a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles R. Breyer and Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-MD-02996

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sallie Kim

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Washington County Fiscal Court

Meade County Fiscal Court

Menifee County Fiscal Court

City of Henderson, Kentucky

Green County Fiscal Court

Breckinridge County Fiscal Court

Nelson County Fiscal Court

Hardin County Fiscal Court

Ohio County Fiscal Court

Board of County Commissioners of Kay County

City of Pembroke Pines, Florida

County of Genesee

Town of Auburn

City of Buffalo

County of Chautauqua

County of Chemung

County of Chenango

County of Clinton

Defendants

McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States

McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.

624 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew M. Grabhorn

Attorney at Grabhorn Law Insured Rights

2525 Nelson Miller Parkway, Suite 107

Louisville, KY 40223

Michael D. Grabhorn

Attorney at Grabhorn Law Insured Rights

2525 Nelson Miller Parkway, Suite 107

Louisville, KY 40223

William D. Nefzger

Attorney at Bahe Cook Cantley and Nefzger PLC

1041 Goss Avenue

Louisville, KY 40217

Curtis N Bruehl,

Attorney at The Bruehl Law Firm PLLC

14005 N Eastern Ave

Edmond, OK 73013

Harrison C Lujan

Attorney at Fulmer Sill PLLC

1101 N. Broadway Ave., Suiet 102

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

James D Sill

Attorney at Fulmer Sill PLLC

1101 N Broadway Ste 102

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Matthew P Browne

Attorney at Browne Pelican PLLC

7007 Shook Ave.

Dallas, TX 75214

Bradley C West

Attorney at The West Law Firm

124 W Highland St

Shawnee, OK 74801

Matthew J Sill

Attorney at Sill Law Group

14005 N Eastern Ave

Edmond, OK 73013

Terry W West

Attorney at The West Law Firm

124 W Highland St

Shawnee, OK 74801

Aelish Marie Baig

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Hadiya Khan Deshmukh

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Nicolle B Brito

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman Dowd LLP

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

James Dennis Young

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan

76 S. Laura St., Suite 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Taeva Cantor Shefler

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

One Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Debra Potter Klauber

Attorney at Haliczer Pettis & Schwamm PA

100 Se 3Rd Avenue, 7Th Floor

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Eugene K. Pettis

Attorney at Haliczer, Pettis & Schwamm, PA

One Financial Plaza, Seventh Floor, 100 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33394

Defendant Attorneys

Kara M. Stewart

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

100 West Main Street, Suite 900

Lexington, KY 40507

Lindsey Walker West

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

100 West Main Street, Suite 900

Lexington, KY 40507

Amanda M. Lockaby

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP

100 West Main Street, Suite 900

Lexington, KY 40507

361 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

400 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

400 #400

Main Document

#398

(#398) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #397 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss ) Filed by All Plaintiffs filed byCounty of Santa Cruz, California. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/16/2022) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

397 #1

Exhibit McKinsey's Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss

397 #397

Main Document

#396

(#396) NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam Ellora Marks (Marks, Miriam) (Filed on 6/13/2022) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#395

(#395) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Catherine Humphreville (Humphreville, Catherine) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

383 #1

Proposed Order

383 #383

Main Document

#10

#9

#8

#6

5 #1

Exhibit Certficate of Good Standing

#5

4 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#4

#1

571 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#400) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael T. Maroney ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17310582.) filed by Robyn Hurley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Maroney, Michael) (Filed on 6/30/2022) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #383 MOTION to Lift the Discovery Stay. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket(#399) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION to Lift the Discovery Stay hearing set for July 15, 2022 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 2, 2022 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Brey er. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#398) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #397 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss ) Filed by All Plaintiffs filed byCounty of Santa Cruz, California. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/16/2022) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#397) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by McKinsey & Company Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit McKinsey's Supplemental Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 6/15/2022) Modified on 6/16/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#396) NOTICE of Appearance by Miriam Ellora Marks (Marks, Miriam) (Filed on 6/13/2022) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#395) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Catherine Humphreville (Humphreville, Catherine) (Filed on 6/9/2022) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#394) REPLY Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of ( #383 MOTION to Lift the Discovery Stay) filed by Accomack County, Virginia, et al. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/2/2022) Modified on 6/2/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#393) Request for Judicial Notice in support of #392 Supplemental Brief in Opposition to McKinsey Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on the Grounds of Res Judicata and Release filed by Accomack County, Virginia, et al. (Related document(s) #392 ) (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/2/2022) Modified on 6/2/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#392) Supplemental Brief in Opposition to #310 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaints on the Grounds of Res Judicata and Release filed by Accomack County, Virginia, et al. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth J. Cabraser, #2 Exhibit H - Plaintiffs Corrected Memorandum in Support of Certification of Rule 23(b)(3) Cities/Counties Negotiation Class, #3 Exhibit I - Plaintiffs Trial Brief for Phase 2, #4 Exhibit J - Walgreens and Walmart Joint Abatement Phase Trial Brief, #5 Exhibit K - Trial Transcript, #6 Exhibit L - Motion of the Ad Hoc Committee of States Holding Consumer Protection Claims Seeking Relief with Respect to the Order Establishing Mediation Protocol)(Related document(s) #310 ) (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/2/2022) Modified on 6/2/2022 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
386 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Fastiff (Fastiff, Eric) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Re #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew M. Grabhorn. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2021. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Michael D. Grabhorn. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Julian Newman (Newman, Stephen) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16066469.) filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, City of Henderson, Kentucky, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Menifee County Fiscal Court, Nelson County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court, Washington County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certficate of Good Standing)(Grabhorn, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew M. Grabhorn ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16066471.) filed by Breckinridge County Fiscal Court, City of Henderson, Kentucky, Green County Fiscal Court, Hardin County Fiscal Court, Meade County Fiscal Court, Menifee County Fiscal Court, Nelson County Fiscal Court, Ohio County Fiscal Court, Washington County Fiscal Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Grabhorn, Andrew) (Filed on 6/11/2021) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re Pro Hac Vice Admission. Counsel who are not admitted to practice before the Northern District of California must file an application to be admitted pro hac vice. See N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 11-3. The requirement that pro hac vice counsel retain local counsel, see N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 11-3(a)(3) and 11-3(e), is waived and does not apply to this MDL action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE:. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). Status Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscour ts.gov/crb Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 26, 2021 at 3:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.usco urts.gov/zoom/. Status Conference set for 7/29/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel on 6/8/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meade County Fiscal Court is a litigant

Latest cases where Nelson County Fiscal Court is a litigant