This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 07:46:04 (UTC).

In Re: Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 In Re Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L P was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-08136

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Appellant

Vanio Cesar Pickler Aguiar

In Re, Debtors and Appellees

Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P.

GOL Linhas Aereas S.A.

MatlinPatterson PE Holdings LLC

MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC

MatlinPatterson Global Partners II LLC

MatlinPatterson Global Opportunities Partners (Cayman) II L.P.

MatlinPatterson Global Opportunities Partners (SUB) II L.P.

Volo Logistics LLC

VRG Linhas Aereas S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Gregory S. Grossman

Attorney at Sequor Law, PA

1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1250

Miami, FL 33131

Juan Jose Mendoza

Attorney at Sequor Law, PA

1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1250

Miami, FL 33131

Appellee Attorneys

Adam Craig Harris

Attorney at Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

David Reuben Zylberberg

Attorney at Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Elisha David Graff

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Jamie Johanna Fell

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP (NY)

425 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Kelly Koscuiszka

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Tyler Brooks Robinson

One Ropemaker Street, London

Arthur Jay Steinberg

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP (NYC)

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Scott Ian Davidson

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP (NYC)

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) ORDER: On October 7, 2022, the Court scheduled a telephonic conference in this matter and a related matter at 22 Civ. 8110 (PAE) for November 2, 2022, at 2 p.m. Dkt. 22. The purpose of that conference is to discuss whether this Court should treat as final, and therefore appropriate for appeal, one of the Bankruptcy Court orders at issue in this matter and a related matter at 22 Civ. 8110 (PAE). On October 26, 2022, the Court received notices of appeal availability in both matters, see Dkts. 27, 28 (22 Civ. 8136 (PAE)); 9 (22 Civ. 8110 (PAE)), triggering automatic deadlines for appellant's briefing for November 25, 2022. In light of the forthcoming conference, the Court adjourns that deadline in both cases sine die. The Court will set new deadlines at the conference on November 2, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/27/2022) (va) Modified on 10/27/2022 (va). (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#28

(#28) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 11/25/2022..(bkar) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#27

(#27) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 11/25/2022..(bkar) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#26

(#26) AMENDED COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P...(bkar) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#25

(#25) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P..(bkar) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC, MatlinPatterson Global Opportunities Partners (Cayman) II L.P., MatlinPatterson Global Opportunities Partners (SUB) II L.P., MatlinPatterson Global Partners II LLC, MatlinPatterson PE Holdings LLC, Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P., Volo Logistics LLC..(McLendon, Kathrine) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

23 #1

Exhibit Statement of Issues

23 #23

Main Document

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

19 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

19 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

19 #1

Exhibit Affidavit in Support

19 #19

Main Document

18 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER: On November 2, 2022, the Court issued the following briefing schedule in two of these matters: 22 Civ. 8136 and 22 Civ. 8110. See Dkt. 22. Appellant's opening brief is due November 29, 2022. Appellees' opposition briefs are due December 23, 2022. Appellant's reply brief is due January 11, 2023. On November 9, 2022, the Court accepted a third appeal-22 Civ. 9568-as related. The Court intends to set the same briefing schedule in this matter, but it can only do so upon notification that the appeal record is complete on the docket. Accordingly, the Court urges the parties to promptly file their respective records of appeal, to permit the Court to proceed to scheduling for the 22 Civ. 9568 matter. SO ORDERED. ( Appellant Brief due by 11/29/2022. Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/11/2023. Appellee Brief due by 12/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/10/2022) (va) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Telephone Conference held on 11/2/2022. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: On November 2, 2022, the Court held a telephonic conference in these related matters. See Dkt. 22. As previewed to the parties, the Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule: Appellant's opening brief is due November 29, 2022. Appellees' opposition briefs are due December 23, 2022. Appellant's reply brief is due January 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. ( Appellant Brief due by 11/29/2022. Appellant Reply Brief due by 1/11/2023. Appellee Brief due by 12/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/2/2022) (va) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER: On October 7, 2022, the Court scheduled a telephonic conference in this matter and a related matter at 22 Civ. 8110 (PAE) for November 2, 2022, at 2 p.m. Dkt. 22. The purpose of that conference is to discuss whether this Court should treat as final, and therefore appropriate for appeal, one of the Bankruptcy Court orders at issue in this matter and a related matter at 22 Civ. 8110 (PAE). On October 26, 2022, the Court received notices of appeal availability in both matters, see Dkts. 27, 28 (22 Civ. 8136 (PAE)); 9 (22 Civ. 8110 (PAE)), triggering automatic deadlines for appellant's briefing for November 25, 2022. In light of the forthcoming conference, the Court adjourns that deadline in both cases sine die. The Court will set new deadlines at the conference on November 2, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/27/2022) (va) Modified on 10/27/2022 (va). (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 11/25/2022..(bkar) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 11/25/2022..(bkar) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AMENDED COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P...(bkar) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P..(bkar) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by MatlinPatterson Global Advisers LLC, MatlinPatterson Global Opportunities Partners (Cayman) II L.P., MatlinPatterson Global Opportunities Partners (SUB) II L.P., MatlinPatterson Global Partners II LLC, MatlinPatterson PE Holdings LLC, Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P., Volo Logistics LLC..(McLendon, Kathrine) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Vanio Cesar Pickler Aguiar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Issues).(bkar) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-08110-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Tyler Robinson dated September 23, 2022 Document filed by Matlinpatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L.P...(Robinson, Tyler) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 1:22-cv-8110. (gp) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22-cv-8110. Document filed by Vanio Cesar Pickler Aguiar..(bkar) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 22-cv-8136. (bkar) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge David S. Jones dated August 30, 2022. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 21-B-11255 (DSJ). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Vanio Cesar Pickler Aguiar..(bkar) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MatlinPatterson Global Opportunities Partners II L is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Jose Mendoza

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory S. Grossman