Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 10:06:24 (UTC).

In re: Mallinckrodt plc, et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 In re Mallinckrodt plc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00398

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Appellants

City of Rockford, Illinois

Steamfitters Local Union No. 420

Acument Global Technologies

The International Union of Operating Engineers Local 542

United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey

Debtor

Mallinckrodt plc, et al

Appellees

Mallinckrodt plc

Legalpeople

Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

Gonzalez Calvillo, S.C.

Shook Hardy and Bacon LLP

Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

Venable LLP

Littler Mendelson, P.C.

Butler Snow LLP

Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Flom LLP

LegalPartners Group, LLC

WilliamsMcCarthy LLP

Post & Schell, PC

Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Daniel Kevin Astin

Attorney at Ciardi Ciardi & Astin

1204 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Amanda Rose Steele

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michael J. Merchant

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Mark David Collins

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brendan Joseph Schlauch

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert J. Stearn, Jr.

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

James A. Tomberlin

Melissa Arbus Sherry

Aaron E. Moore

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

1007 N. Orange Street, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Jay S. Rothman, Esq. Insufficient address, unable to forward. (sam) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron E. Moore on behalf of Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin (Moore, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#9

(#9) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/1/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#8

(#8) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/30/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#7

(#7) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Mallinckrodt plc //Appellees' Counter-Designation of Items to Be Included in Record on Appeal (Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER, Appellant shall pay the $298 filing fee to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice.(See Order for further details) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/3/2021.Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/1/2021. (myr) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James A. Tomberlin - filed by Mallinckrodt plc. (Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa Arbus Sherry - filed by Mallinckrodt plc. (Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (kmd) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #1

Order on Appeal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 3/5/2021 by The Honorable John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 20-12522 (JTD). Fee Status not paid.- filed by United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey, The International Union of Operating Engineers Local 542, Steamfitters Local Union No. 420, Acument Global Technologies, City of Rockford, Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(kmd) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to Jay S. Rothman, Esq. Insufficient address, unable to forward. (sam) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron E. Moore on behalf of Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin (Moore, Aaron) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORAL ORDER: Having received a recommendation #8 from Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge that this matter be withdrawn from the mandatory referral for mediation and proceed through the appellate process of this Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the recommendation is ACCEPTED and the proposed briefing schedule set forth in the recommendation is hereby ADOPTED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/4/21. (ntl) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/1/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/30/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRemark: $298 bankruptcy appeal fee paid on 3/21/2021, receipt number A10248103. (amf) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by Mallinckrodt plc //Appellees' Counter-Designation of Items to Be Included in Record on Appeal (Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER, Appellant shall pay the $298 filing fee to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice.(See Order for further details) Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/3/2021.Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/1/2021. (myr) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Melissa Arbus Sherry,James A. Tomberlin for Mallinckrodt plc added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James A. Tomberlin filed by Mallinckrodt plc, #4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa Arbus Sherry filed by Mallinckrodt plc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/1/21. (ntl) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James A. Tomberlin - filed by Mallinckrodt plc. (Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Melissa Arbus Sherry - filed by Mallinckrodt plc. (Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4/9/21 by 4:00 p.m., the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Daniel Taylor, Law Clerk for Judge Thynge, at daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/19/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (kmd) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (kmd) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (kmd) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 3/5/2021 by The Honorable John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 20-12522 (JTD). Fee Status not paid.- filed by United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey, The International Union of Operating Engineers Local 542, Steamfitters Local Union No. 420, Acument Global Technologies, City of Rockford, Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(kmd) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Association of Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 322 of Southern New Jersey is a litigant

Latest cases where Shook, Hardy & Bacon is a litigant

Latest cases where SKADDEN ARPS SLATE MEAGHER & FLOM LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where BUTLER SNOW, LLP is a litigant