This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2020 at 13:37:19 (UTC).

IN RE: Lohengrin, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 IN RE Lohengrin, Ltd was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-60970

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Smith

 

Party Details

In Re, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Lohengrin, Ltd.

Counter Claimants and Claimants

Universal Marine Center, Inc

200 Se 13 Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

TQY LLC

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC

Tommy Le

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

In Re, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Eric Foreman

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, PA

One Biscayne Tower, 2 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131-1803

Darren Wayne Friedman

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, PA

2 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2300, One Biscayne Tower

Miami, FL 33131

Paul T. Bagley

Attorney at Foreman Friedman, P.A.

2 South Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2300

Miami, FL 33131

Counter Claimant and Claimant Attorneys

Andrew Nicholas Mescolotto

Attorney at Fertig & Gramling

200 Se 13Th Street

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Cullin Avram O'Brien

Attorney at Cullin O'Brien Law, P.A.

6541 Ne 21St Way

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33308

Craig Mitchell Greene

Attorney at Kramer Green Zuckerman Greene & Buchsbaum

4000 Hollywood Boulevard, Suite 485 South

Hollywood, FL 33021

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, #9 Answer to Complaint, #8 Answer to Complaint, Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Claims by Lohengrin, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bagley, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#12

(#12) Notice of Action/Publication filed by Lohengrin, Ltd.. (Bagley, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

11 #2

Exhibit B - Disputed Sea Tow Invoice to be Indemnified by Lohengrin, Ltd.

11 #1

Exhibit A - UMC Dockage and Services Agreement Signed by Captain of M/Y Lohengri

#11

(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Limitation of Liability, First COUNTERCLAIM for Breach of Contract and Negligence against Lohengrin, Ltd. by Universal Marine Center, Inc. Attorney Andrew Nicholas Mescolotto added to party Universal Marine Center, Inc(pty:clm). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UMC Dockage and Services Agreement Signed by Captain of M/Y Lohengrin, #2 Exhibit B - Disputed Sea Tow Invoice to be Indemnified by Lohengrin, Ltd.)(Mescolotto, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint ON BEHALF OF CLAIMANTS TOMMY LE AND TQY LLC, COUNTERCLAIM ON BEHALF OF CLAIMANTS TOMMY LE AND TQY LLC against Lohengrin, Ltd. by TQY LLC. (O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) Respondent, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand AND CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) Respondent, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand AND CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Mitchell Greene on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC. Attorney Craig Mitchell Greene added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC(pty:clm), Attorney Craig Mitchell Greene added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC(pty:clm). (Greene, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cullin Avram O'Brien on behalf of TQY LLC, Tommy Le. Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TQY LLC(pty:clm), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party Tommy Le(pty:clm). (O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims; granting [1-5] MOTION for Leave to File Ad Interim Stipulation. If any claimant desires to contest Plaintiffs right to exoneration from or limitation of liability, Claimant shall, on or before 6/25/2020, file an answer to the Complaint in this Court and serve copies on Plaintiffs attorney, or be defaulted. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Lohengrin, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Darren) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Bagley on behalf of Lohengrin, Ltd. (Bagley, Paul) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #2

Text of Proposed Order Monition

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Claimants claims brought by Buckner Bay, Tin Man, TQY Claimants, and UMC. Responses due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/22/2020. (ogn) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #11 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, #9 Answer to Complaint, #8 Answer to Complaint, Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Claims by Lohengrin, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bagley, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Action/Publication filed by Lohengrin, Ltd.. (Bagley, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint for Limitation of Liability, First COUNTERCLAIM for Breach of Contract and Negligence against Lohengrin, Ltd. by Universal Marine Center, Inc. Attorney Andrew Nicholas Mescolotto added to party Universal Marine Center, Inc(pty:clm). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - UMC Dockage and Services Agreement Signed by Captain of M/Y Lohengrin, #2 Exhibit B - Disputed Sea Tow Invoice to be Indemnified by Lohengrin, Ltd.)(Mescolotto, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint ON BEHALF OF CLAIMANTS TOMMY LE AND TQY LLC, COUNTERCLAIM ON BEHALF OF CLAIMANTS TOMMY LE AND TQY LLC against Lohengrin, Ltd. by TQY LLC. (O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Respondent, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand AND CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Respondent, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand AND CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Greene, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Mitchell Greene on behalf of Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC. Attorney Craig Mitchell Greene added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Buckner Bay Marine, LLC(pty:clm), Attorney Craig Mitchell Greene added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America as subrogee of Tin Man's Pride, LLC(pty:clm). (Greene, Craig) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cullin Avram O'Brien on behalf of TQY LLC, Tommy Le. Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party TQY LLC(pty:clm), Attorney Cullin Avram O'Brien added to party Tommy Le(pty:clm). (O'Brien, Cullin) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims; granting [1-5] MOTION for Leave to File Ad Interim Stipulation. If any claimant desires to contest Plaintiffs right to exoneration from or limitation of liability, Claimant shall, on or before 6/25/2020, file an answer to the Complaint in this Court and serve copies on Plaintiffs attorney, or be defaulted. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Order Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Lohengrin, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Darren) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Bagley on behalf of Lohengrin, Ltd. (Bagley, Paul) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against Lohengrin, Ltd.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12893971, filed by Lohengrin, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of all Known Claimants, #2 Text of Proposed Order Monition, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Value, #4 Exhibit Declaration of No Pending Freight, #5 Exhibit Motion for Leave to File AIS, #6 Exhibit N-Filing List of All Known Claimants, #7 Exhibit N-Publication, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Darren) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Property Casualty Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Nicholas Mescolotto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Mitchell Greene

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cullin Avram O'Brien