This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2020 at 11:51:36 (UTC).

In Re: Lisa Golden

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 In Re Lisa Golden was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew G. Schopler, Larry Alan Burns, Dana M. Sabraw and Nita L. Stormes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00999

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Andrew G. Schopler

Nita L. Stormes

Presiding Judges

Larry Alan Burns

Dana M. Sabraw

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

Lisa Kaye Golden

Coronado, CA 92178

Appellee

Richard Kipperman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Gary Edward Slater

Attorney at Slater & Truxaw LLP

15373 Innovation Drive, Suite 210

San Diego, CA 92128

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-02089-DMS-NLS. The new case number is 20cv0999-DMS-NLS. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/1/2020.(jdt) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER Partially Granting Plaintiff's Application for Order Allowing CM/ECF Access. The Court grants Plaintiff access to the CM/ECF system for cases pertaining to this matter that are assigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw. However, the Court does not grant Plaintiff access to file documents in these cases electronically. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/7/2020.(aef) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

1 #3

Transmittal

1 #2

Referral

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT and Statement of Election. Bankruptcy Court case number: 17-06928. BK Internal Control Appeal Number: 13., filed by Lisa Kaye Golden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Referral, #3 Transmittal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-999-LAB-AGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms). (Entered: 06/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-02089-DMS-NLS. The new case number is 20cv0999-DMS-NLS. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/1/2020.(jdt) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Partially Granting Plaintiff's Application for Order Allowing CM/ECF Access. The Court grants Plaintiff access to the CM/ECF system for cases pertaining to this matter that are assigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw. However, the Court does not grant Plaintiff access to file documents in these cases electronically. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/7/2020.(aef) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT and Statement of Election. Bankruptcy Court case number: 17-06928. BK Internal Control Appeal Number: 13., filed by Lisa Kaye Golden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Referral, #3 Transmittal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-999-LAB-AGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms). (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less