This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2020 at 08:32:06 (UTC).

In Re: Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 In Re Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01457

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Petitioner and In Re

Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.

Claimant

Leslie Burns

Defendant

Polaris Boats, LLC

Interested Parties

Pontoon Boat, LLC

Brunswick Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Steven T. Jaffe

Attorney at Hall Jaffe & Clayton, LLP

7425 Peak Drive

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Taylor Robert Anderson

Attorney at Hall Jaffe & Clayton

7425 Peak Drive, Suite 460

Las Vegas, NV 89128

Claimant Attorneys

Donald J. Campbell

Attorney at Campbell & Williams

700 South Seventh Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Samuel R. Mirkovich

Attorney at Campbell & Williams

700 S. 7Th Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Margaret M Higgins

Attorney at Campbell & Williams

700 S. 7Th St.

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

Karie N. Wilson

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Bruce Alverson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Dawn L. Davis

Attorney at c/o Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

3883 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 1100

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

25 #4

Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Video Recordings of Boat Inspection on 9/17/19

25 #3

Exhibit 2 - Video Recordings of Boat Inspection on 9/17/19 (Manually Filed)

25 #2

Exhibit 1 - LVBH's Crossclaims against Mercury Marine, a Division of Brunsw

25 #1

Declaration Declaration of Samuel R. Mirkovich

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

5 #2

Proposed Order

#5

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

3 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY to Response to #16 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Polaris Boats, LLC. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Manual Filing by Claimant Leslie Burns re #25 Reply,. Object: Disk, Volume(s): 1, Description: The disk contains Exhibit 2 to ECF No. 25, which contains two short video clips captured at the September 17, 2019 Boat Inspection., manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Mirkovich, Samuel) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Claimant Leslie Burns. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Samuel R. Mirkovich, #2 Exhibit 1 - LVBH's Crossclaims against Mercury Marine, a Division of Brunswick Corporation, and Polaris Boats, LLC, #3 Exhibit 2 - Video Recordings of Boat Inspection on 9/17/19 (Manually Filed), #4 Exhibit 3 - Transcript of Video Recordings of Boat Inspection on 9/17/19) (Mirkovich, Samuel) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Dismiss,, #16 Motion to Dismiss, by Petitioner Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Taylor R. Anderson) (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Polaris Boats, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Polaris Boats, LLC, Other Affiliate Polaris, Inc., Other Affiliate Polaris Sales, Inc., Other Affiliate Cincinnati Specialist Underwriters, Other Affiliate AXIS Insurance, Other Affiliate Sompo Insurance Company for Polaris Boats, LLC added. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Stipulation; Re: #9 Motion to Dismiss,, #16 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #9 and #16 Motions to Dismiss, by Petitioner Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.. (Jaffe, Steven) Modified on 8/31/2020 to add additional document link (MMM). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Polaris Boats, LLC.(Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to #5 Motion, by Petitioner Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.. (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINDER to #9 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Polaris Boats, LLC. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Claimant Leslie Burns. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Samuel R. Mirkovich, #2 Exhibit 1 - 7/9/19 Letter to LVBH, #3 Exhibit 2 - 7/24/19 HJC Rep Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - 8/2/19 Notice of Claim Letters, #5 Exhibit 4 - 8/6/19 Email Chain, #6 Exhibit 5 - 8/9/19 Email HJC to Mercury Marine, #7 Exhibit 6 - 8/13/19 Polaris Letter, #8 Exhibit 7 - 8/29/19 Notice of Claim Letter, #9 Exhibit 8 - 9/11/19 Letter Re: Spoliation, #10 Exhibit 9 - 9/17/19 Inspection Attendees Email, #11 Exhibit 10 - 9/17/19 Incident Report) (Mirkovich, Samuel) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of CLAIMS OF LESLIE BURNS re #1 Complaint, filed by Leslie Burns.(Mirkovich, Samuel) Modified event on 8/19/2020 (MMM). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Leslie Burns. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/2/2020.(Mirkovich, Samuel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified text on 8/19/2020 (MMM). (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #5 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Steven Jaffe and Taylor Anderson.Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document.No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION Application for (A) Issuance of Order Directing Notice of Limitation and (B) Enjoining Suits by Petitioner Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.. Responses due by 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Posting of Security by Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Jaffe, Steven) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint, 2 QC Notice, by Petitioner Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jaffe, Steven) Modified on 8/6/2020 to remove incorrect document link (MMM). (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . No complaint/initiating document was filed.Counsel is advised to file the complaint/initiating document, along with the civil cover sheet, using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 . (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VIEW #3 corrected image to COMPLAINT for Exoneration from Liability or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6114200) by Las Vegas Boat Harbor, Inc.. Proof of service due by 11/3/2020. (Jaffe, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified text on 8/6/2020 (MMM). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRUNSWICK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dawn L. Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karie N. Wilson