This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/06/2021 at 08:41:45 (UTC).

In Re: Kimberly Bruce

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 In Re Kimberly Bruce was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Seibel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-07455

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Seibel

 

Party Details

Appellants

Citigroup Inc.

Citibank, N.A.

Debtor, Appellee and In Re

Kimberly Bruce

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Benjamin Robert Nagin

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Eamon Paul Joyce

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Jonathan Warren Muenz

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Sarah Goodfield

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Ave.

New York, NY 10019

Appellee Attorneys

Adam Reese Shaw

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP (Albany)

30 South Pearl Street

Albany, NY 12207

Charles Wayne Juntikka

Attorney at Charles Juntikka & Associates, LLP

1250 Broadway, 24Th Flr.

New York, NY 10001

George F. Carpinello

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

30 South Pearl Street, 11Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

Jeffrey Steven Shelly

Attorney at Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP (Albany)

30 South Pearl Street

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #9 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2)., #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Kimberly Bruce..(Shaw, Adam) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

11 #5

Exhibit E

11 #4

Exhibit D

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2). Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc...(Nagin, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Goodfield on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc...(Goodfield, Sarah) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#7

(#7) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE the Parties stipulate and agree: 1. Defendants-Appellants shall file their Direct Appeal Certification Motion by September 27, 2021. 2. Plaintiff-Appellee shall file her opposition to the Leave to Appeal Motion and the Direct Appeal Certification Motion (as separate responses or a consolidated response) by October 27, 2021. 3. Defendants-Appellants shall file their reply (or replies) in support of their Leave to Appeal Motion and Direct Appeal Certification Motion by November 10, 2021. 4. This briefing schedule shall supersede the schedule so ordered on September 7, 2021. See Dkt. No. 5. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/27/2021. Responses due by 10/27/2021. Replies due by 11/10/2021.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/13/2021) (mml) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #1

Declaration of Jon W. Muenz in Support

3 #3

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re: #11 Letter filed by Kimberly Bruce: Application for reassignment denied. The subject of the instant appeal is sufficiently distinct from the issues in the matters previously adjudicated by Judge Briccetti that there is no efficiency-related reason to deviate from random assignment. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel) (Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #9 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2)., #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal . Document filed by Kimberly Bruce..(Shaw, Adam) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from George F. Carpinello dated October 27, 2021 re: Assignment of Judge. Document filed by Kimberly Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Carpinello, George) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Sarah T. Goodfield in Support re: #9 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2).. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Goodfield, Sarah) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 158(d)(2). Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc...(Nagin, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Goodfield on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc...(Goodfield, Sarah) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE the Parties stipulate and agree: 1. Defendants-Appellants shall file their Direct Appeal Certification Motion by September 27, 2021. 2. Plaintiff-Appellee shall file her opposition to the Leave to Appeal Motion and the Direct Appeal Certification Motion (as separate responses or a consolidated response) by October 27, 2021. 3. Defendants-Appellants shall file their reply (or replies) in support of their Leave to Appeal Motion and Direct Appeal Certification Motion by November 10, 2021. 4. This briefing schedule shall supersede the schedule so ordered on September 7, 2021. See Dkt. No. 5. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/27/2021. Responses due by 10/27/2021. Replies due by 11/10/2021.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/13/2021) (mml) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Benjamin R. Nagin dated September 10, 2021 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(Nagin, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff-Appellee's brief in opposition to motion due 10/7/21. Defendant-Appellants' reply due 10/22/21. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Adam Shaw dated September 7, 2021. Document filed by Kimberly Bruce..(Shaw, Adam) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon W. Muenz in Support, #2 Exhibit A).(bkar) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Robert D. Drain dated August 10, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 14-8224A, 13-B-22088 (RDD). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(bkar) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Warren Muenz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eamon Paul Joyce