This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2020 at 18:47:22 (UTC).

In Re: Kidd

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 In Re Kidd was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00800

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

In Re and Petitioner

Robert Gordon Kidd

Respondents

John Thomas Reynolds

Mark McCall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Adam Lavine

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP

800 Third Avenue, 6Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10022

Michael S. Kim

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP

800 Third Avenue, Fl 6

New York, NY 10022

Bryan L. LeClerc

Attorney at Berchem Moses P.C.

75 Broad St.

Milford, CT 06460

Respondent Attorneys

Joseph Myer Sanderson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Aaron Marks

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Benjamin H. Diessel

Attorney at Wiggin & Dana-NH

One Century Tower, 265 Church Street P.O. Box 1832

New Haven, CT 06508-1832

Jordan D. Peterson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Benjamin M. Daniels

Attorney at Wiggin & Dana-NH

265 Church St., P.O. Box 1832

New Haven, CT 06510

Toby S. Soli

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

200 Park Ave

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#55

52 #1

Exhibit 1- 6/22/20 Letter

#52

#51

#50

35 #2

Exhibit 2 - Motion Hearing Transcript of 5/1/20

35 #1

Exhibit 1 - Decl. of Alexander Garioch, attaching Ex A - Court Order

#35

#3

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Proposed Order

1 #5

Exhibit 14

1 #4

Declaration, Kim

1 #3

Declaration, Hume

1 #2

Declaration, Kerr

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Hearing held on 8/19/2020 via ZOOM. Total Time: 1 hours and 35 minutes(Court Reporter Tracy Gow.) (Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Motion Hearing scheduled for 8/19/2020 at 2:00pm will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1616468209?pwd=bnNKczFad1YrVjJmSGRQaWVJckNJdz09 and call in number is +16468287666,,1616468209#,,,,,,0#,,349615# US (New York).Meeting ID: 161 646 8209 Meeting Password: 349615Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Hearing set for 8/19/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Cahill, Leslie) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER Setting Hearing on Respondents' #35 Objection to the Order Denying the Motion to Quash and Petitioner's #51 Response to the Objection. The parties shall appear for a hearing on 8/19/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/14/2020. (Cahill, Leslie) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE re #51 Response, #35 Objection, by Mark McCall, John Thomas Reynolds/ Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Respondents' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Ruling on their Motion to Quash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- 6/22/20 Letter)(Marks, Aaron) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) RESPONSE re #35 Objection, filed by Robert Gordon Kidd. (Lavine, Adam) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/10/2020.(Gould, K.) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#49) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/10/2020. Total Time: 15 minutes(Court Reporter Tracy Gow.) (Gould, K.) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER. Following the telephonic status conference held on June 10, 2020, the Court orders the following briefing schedule regarding #35 Respondents' objection to the ruling on the motion to quash. Petitioner shall file his response to the objection on or before June 23, 2020. Respondents shall file their reply brief on or before July 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/10/2020. (Cahill, Leslie) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Conference Line: (888) 278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Cahill, Leslie) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Quash by Mark McCall, John Thomas Reynolds.Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Alexander Garioch, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Garioch Declaration, #4 Affidavit John Thomas Reynolds, #5 Affidavit Mark McCall)(Soli, Toby) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Toby S. Soli on behalf of John Thomas Reynolds, Mark McCall (Soli, Toby) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2020. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #1 Ex Parte Application. For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, the Application (Doc. No. 1) is granted such that petitioner Kidd's counsel is authorized, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782, to issue subpoenas in the form attached as Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Michael S. Kim (Doc. No. 1-4). The order is without prejudice to the respondents' rights to assert objections in relation to the subpoenas. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 02/28/2020. (LaRue-Zitzkat, Sage) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam Michael Lavine to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5720289) by Robert Gordon Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B)(LeClerc, Bryan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. LeClerc on behalf of Robert Gordon Kidd (LeClerc, Bryan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received from Remy Cipriano: $47.00, receipt number CTXB00010982. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 02/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Kim on behalf of Robert Gordon Kidd. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) EXPARTE APPLICATION for Order Under 28:1782 by Robert Gordon Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, Kerr, #3 Declaration, Hume, #4 Declaration, Kim, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Sangyun Kim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Lavine Esq.