This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2020 at 08:18:48 (UTC).

In Re: Kidd

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 In Re Kidd was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas O. Farrish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-MC-00016

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas O. Farrish

 

Party Details

In Re and Petitioner

Robert Gordon Kidd

Respondents

John Thomas Reynolds

Mark McCall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael S. Kim

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP

800 Third Avenue, Fl 6

New York, NY 10022

Adam Lavine

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP

800 Third Avenue, 6Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10022

Bryan L. LeClerc

Attorney at Berchem Moses P.C.

75 Broad St.

Milford, CT 06460

Respondent Attorney

Toby S. Soli

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

200 Park Ave

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

11 #16

Exhibit P

11 #15

Exhibit O

11 #13

Exhibit M

11 #8

Exhibit H

11 #7

Exhibit G

11 #6

Exhibit F

11 #5

Exhibit E

11 #4

Exhibit D

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

9 #5

Affidavit Mark McCall

9 #4

Affidavit John Thomas Reynolds

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibits to Garioch Declaration

9 #2

Affidavit Alexander Garioch

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Quash filed by Mark McCall, John Thomas Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Affidavit Lavine, #18 Affidavit Kerr)(LeClerc, Bryan) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lavine on behalf of Robert Gordon Kidd (Lavine, Adam) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Quash by Mark McCall, John Thomas Reynolds.Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Alexander Garioch, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Garioch Declaration, #4 Affidavit John Thomas Reynolds, #5 Affidavit Mark McCall)(Soli, Toby) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Toby S. Soli on behalf of John Thomas Reynolds, Mark McCall (Soli, Toby) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2020. (Wood, R.) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #1 Ex Parte Application. For the reasons stated in the attached Ruling, the Application (Doc. No. 1) is granted such that petitioner Kidd's counsel is authorized, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782, to issue subpoenas in the form attached as Exhibits 1 and 2 to the Declaration of Michael S. Kim (Doc. No. 1-4). The order is without prejudice to the respondents' rights to assert objections in relation to the subpoenas. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 02/28/2020. (LaRue-Zitzkat, Sage) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam Michael Lavine to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5720289) by Robert Gordon Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B)(LeClerc, Bryan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan L. LeClerc on behalf of Robert Gordon Kidd (LeClerc, Bryan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received from Remy Cipriano: $47.00, receipt number CTXB00010982. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 02/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Kim on behalf of Robert Gordon Kidd. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) EXPARTE APPLICATION for Order Under 28:1782 by Robert Gordon Kidd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, Kerr, #3 Declaration, Hume, #4 Declaration, Kim, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Toby S Soli