This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2023 at 05:52:53 (UTC).

In Re: Juul Labs, Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 In Re Juul Labs, Inc , Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-MD-02913

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.C.

J.D.

Sabrina Zampa

John Thomas Via Peavy

Matthew Pedecine

David Masessa

Jonathan Mardis

S.W.

6,806 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony J Patek

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adam Gutride

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Marie Ann McCrary

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew Thomas McCrary

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

4450 Arapahoe Avenue, Suite 100

Boulder, CO 80303

Seth A. Safier

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

100 Pine Street, Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Todd Michael Kennedy

Attorney at Gutride Safier LLP

835 Douglass Street

San Francisco, CA 94114

David J Hodge

Attorney at Attorney at Law

38 Miller Ave #157

Mill Valley, CA 94941

Other Attorneys

Austin Van Schwing

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street Suite 3000

San Franciso, CA 94105-2933

Megan B Greene

Attorney at Office of the Montgomery County Attorney

101 Monroe Street, 3Rd Floor

Rockville, MD 20850

1,104 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#3755

(#3755) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ALTRIA'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL re #3734 MOTION to Stay Pending Altria's Appeal from the Court's June 28, 2022 Class Certification Decision filed by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc.. (Massaro, John) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#3754

(#3754) SECOND AMENDED ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #3746 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#3753

(#3753) ORDER REGARDING TRIAL AS TO THE ALTRIA DEFENDANTS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #3752 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3752

(#3752) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Altria Defendants' Treatment at Trial in SFUSD as a Single Defendant filed by San Francisco Unified School District. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3751

(#3751) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements and Related Materials (Massaro, John) (Filed on 1/12/2023) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#3746

(#3746) Joint Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Second Amended Order Regarding Case Schedule filed by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth) (Filed on 1/11/2023) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

3737 #3737

Main Document

3734 #1

Proposed Order

3734 #3734

Main Document

#8

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#7

6 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#6

#5

#4

#2

#1

9,107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3755) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ALTRIA'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL re #3734 MOTION to Stay Pending Altria's Appeal from the Court's June 28, 2022 Class Certification Decision filed by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc.. (Massaro, John) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3754) SECOND AMENDED ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE by Judge William H. Orrick granting #3746 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3753) ORDER REGARDING TRIAL AS TO THE ALTRIA DEFENDANTS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #3752 Stipulation. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3752) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Altria Defendants' Treatment at Trial in SFUSD as a Single Defendant filed by San Francisco Unified School District. (London, Sarah) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3751) Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Production of Settlement Agreements and Related Materials (Massaro, John) (Filed on 1/12/2023) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3750) CLERK'S NOTICE - The Court will address #3737 proposed CMO No. 17 during the January 20, 2023 Case Management Conference. Counsel who have filed responses or objections to proposed CMO No. 17 by January 17, 2023 will be allowed to address the Court during the CMC. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2023) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3748) Letter from Jonathan R. Gdanski Raising Objections to Settling Defendants' Proposed CMO 17. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mesh MDL PTO_315, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed CMO 17)(Gdanski, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/11/2023) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3747) OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSE re #3737 Notice (Other) - Proposed Case Management Order No. 17 by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc.. (Massaro, John) (Filed on 1/11/2023) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3746) Joint Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Second Amended Order Regarding Case Schedule filed by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc.. (Wilkinson, Beth) (Filed on 1/11/2023) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3749) ORDER of USCA as to #3655 USCA Case Number 22-16695 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for #3649 USCA Case Number 22-80063., #3654 USCA Case Number 22-16694 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for #3339 USCA Case Number 22-80062. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2023) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3,792 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13783291.) filed by Savannah West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Middle District, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar)(VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13783209.) filed by Hallie Helms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing- Bar, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing- Supreme Court, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing- Middle District)(VanZandt, Joseph) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13782975.) filed by Sabrina Zampa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13782920.) filed by Sabrina Zampa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLARIFICATION ON PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/08/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Statement re #2 Pretrial Order Request for Clarification by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re: Pro Hac Vice Admission: Counsel who are not admitted to practice before the Northern District of California must file an application to be admitted pro hac vice. See N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 11-3. The requirement that pro hac vice counsel retain local counsel, see N.D. Cal. Civil Local Rule 11-3(a)(3) and 11-3(e), is waived and does not apply to this MDL action. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSet Hearing - Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/02/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel on October 2, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.W. is a litigant

Latest cases where M.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.D. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan B Greene