This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 07:16:18 (UTC).

In Re: Johns-Manville Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 In Re Johns-Manville Corporation was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04039

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Appellant

Thorpe Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust

In Re and Debtor

Johns-Manville Corporation

Appellee

Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Kayvan Betteridge Sadeghi

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

666 5Th Avenue, 10103

New York, NY 10103

Jantra Van Roy

Attorney at Zeichner, Ellman & Krause, L.L.P.

575 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 01022

Brittany Hope Sokoloff

Attorney at Schiff Hardin

666 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Michael Steven Davis

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Appellee Attorneys

Timothy Michael Haggerty

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP (NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Jason Charles Rubinstein

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP (NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The proposed revised schedule is approved. DE #6 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 10/1/2019.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/24/2019) (anc) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason C. Rubinstein dated June 21, 2019. Document filed by Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust.(Rubinstein, Jason) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (ama) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: granting #4 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason C. Rubinstein dated May 9, 2019. The requested extensions are Granted. DE # 4 resolved. The motion will be taken on submission November 8, 2019 at 10:30 AM is set as a control date for status conference. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 7/3/2019 Replies due by 7/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/14/2019) (ama) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jason C. Rubinstein dated May 9, 2019. Document filed by Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust.(Rubinstein, Jason) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Thorpe Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(bkar) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated March 28, 2019. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 17-1186A, 82-B-11656 (CGM). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Thorpe Insulation Company Asbestos Settlement Trust.(bkar) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNS-MANVILLE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where THORPE INSULATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Charles Rubinstein