This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2019 at 08:33:06 (UTC).

In Re. Jelen et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 In Re Jelen was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-12008

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Appellant

Sean E. Jelen

Ayer, MA 01432

In Re

Sean Jelen

Trustees

Richard King

Anne J. White

Boston, MA 02109

Not Classified By Court

United States Bankruptcy Court, District of Massachusetts

The First National Bank of Long Island

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee Attorney

Anne J. White

Attorney at Demeo LLP

200 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Matthew L. Schwartz

Attorney at Cohn & Dussi LLC

68 Harrison Avenue, Suite 520

Boston, MA 02446

Michael H. Theodore

Attorney at Cohn & Dussi

6Th Floor, 25 Burlington Mall Road

Burlington, MA 01803

 

Court Documents

8 #1

USBC (Worcester) Record

#2

(#2) Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

1 #1

Initial Transmittal

10 #1

USDC Bankruptcy Docket

10 #2

USDC Transmittal Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 USBC (Worcester) Record)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-41137. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#10

(#10) Judge Elizabeth D. Katz: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Debtor's Failure to Pay the Filing Fee Regarding the Debtor's September 23, 2019 Notice of Appeal Following the Court's Denial of the Request to Waive the Filing Fee, and in Accordance with Massachusetts District Court Local Rule 203.8003, the September 23, 2019 Appeal of this Court's September 16, 2019 Order is DISMISSED. (Attachments: #1 USDC Bankruptcy Docket, #2 USDC Transmittal Cover Sheet)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge Elizabeth D. Katz: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Debtor's Failure to Pay the Filing Fee Regarding the Debtor's September 23, 2019 Notice of Appeal Following the Court's Denial of the Request to Waive the Filing Fee, and in Accordance with Massachusetts District Court Local Rule 203.8003, the September 23, 2019 Appeal of this Court's September 16, 2019 Order is DISMISSED. (Attachments: #1 USDC Bankruptcy Docket, #2 USDC Transmittal Cover Sheet)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • (#9) ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 11/12/2019. Appellee Brief due by 11/25/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/9/2019. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 USBC (Worcester) Record)(Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#6) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Case is to be returned to the Clerk's Office to be randomly drawn to a District Judge in accordance with Local Rule 40.1. (Castles, Martin) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#4) Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 9/24/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-12008. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • (#3) Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-41137. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less