This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2021 at 02:20:28 (UTC).

IN RE: January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 IN RE January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cecilia M. Altonaga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-MD-02989

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

 

Party Details

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Ethan Arellano

Michael D Scalia

Carolyn Collier

Patrick Young

Andrea Juncadella

Michael Ridpath

Christine Bukowski

Chastity Woodward

William Urrutia

Matt Scime

Michelle del Valle

Peter Fray

Omar Alsaedi

Charles Fellows

Amanda Giuliani

Consolidated Defendants

Citadel LLC doing business as Citadel Securities

Robinhood Markets, Inc.

Robinhood Financial LLC

Robinhood Securities, LLC

In Re

January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation

173 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

James L. Ferraro

Attorney at The Ferraro Law Firm

600 Brickell Avenuesuite 3800

Miami, FL 33131-3073

James Louis Ferraro, Jr.

Attorney at The Ferraro Law Firm

600 Brickell Avenuesuite 3800

Miami, FL 33131

Natalia Maria Salas

Attorney at The Ferraro Law Firm, P.A.

600 Brickell Avesuite 3800

Miami, FL 33131

Luke Thomas Jacobs

Attorney at Weil Snyder , Ravindran

221 Meridian Aveapt 205

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Marguerite Clare Racher Snyder

Attorney at Weil Quaranta P.A.

200 South Biscayne Boulevardsuite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Ronald Peter Weil

Attorney at Ronald Weil PA

200 S Biscayne Boulevardwachovia Financial Center Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Mathew Daniel Gutierrez

Attorney at The Ferraro Law Firm, P.A.

600 Brickell Avenuesuite 3800

Miami, FL 33131

Sean A. Byrstyn

600 Brickell Avenue, 38Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

Alexander Cabeceiras

One Penn Plaza, Ste. 4905

New York, NY 10119

Caroline Hope Miller

Attorney at Derek Smith Law Group PLLC

1835 Market Streetsuite 2950

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Consolidated Defendant Attorney

John M. Doroghazi

Attorney at Wiggin and Dana, LLP

265 Church Streetp.O. Box 1832

New Haven, CT 06508-1832

Other Attorneys

Michael James McMullen

Attorney at Cohen & McMullen, P.A.

1132 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Marc H. Edelson

Attorney at Edelson Lechtzin LLP

3 Terry Drive, Suite 205

Newtown, PA 18940

Michael R. Fuller

Attorney at OlsenDaines

111 Sw 5Th Ave., Suite 3150

Portland, OR 97204

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

120 South 6Th Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Christian T. Kemnitz

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP

525 West Monroe Streetsuite 1600

Chicago, IL 60661

Pamela Ann Markert

Attorney at Cera LLP

595 Market Street Suite 1350

San Francisco, CA 94105

David J. Worley

Attorney at Evangelista Worley, LLC

8100A Roswell Roadsuite 100

Atlanta, GA 30350

Jeffrey C. Bank

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

1301 Avenue Of The Americas40Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Keith Joseph Wesley

Attorney at Brown George Ross Obrien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 1280

San Francisco, CA 94104

213 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#432

(#432) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Alexander N. Loftus (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

430 #1

Exhibit A - SEC Report

430 #430

Main Document

#431

(#431) ORDER re #428 Joint Status Report. The Lead Plaintiff shall file a master complaint on or before November 30, 2021. Defendants shall file responses to the Lead Plaintiff's master complaint on or before January 7, 2022. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss, the Lead Plaintiff's response in opposition shall be filed by January 28, 2022. Defendants' reply to Lead Plaintiff's response shall be filed by February 11, 2022. A protective order governing confidential information and materials shall be filed by November 23, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

429 #1

Exhibit A

429 #429

Main Document

#428

#427

426 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#413

#408

#388

#10

#9

#8

#7

#2

#1

388 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#432) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Alexander N. Loftus (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#430) Notice of Supplemental Authority re #408 Corrected MOTION TO DISMISS #388 MDL Amended Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pertaining to the Antitrust Tranche Defendant Citadel Securities LLC's Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Antitrust Tranche Complaint by Citadel Securities, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SEC Report) (O'Sullivan, John) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#431) ORDER re #428 Joint Status Report. The Lead Plaintiff shall file a master complaint on or before November 30, 2021. Defendants shall file responses to the Lead Plaintiff's master complaint on or before January 7, 2022. If Defendants file a motion to dismiss, the Lead Plaintiff's response in opposition shall be filed by January 28, 2022. Defendants' reply to Lead Plaintiff's response shall be filed by February 11, 2022. A protective order governing confidential information and materials shall be filed by November 23, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#429) Notice of Supplemental Authority re #413 Response to Motion, Antitrust Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel-Antitrust Tranche (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Saveri, Joseph) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#428) STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order) by Blue Laine-Beveridge (Rosen, Laurence) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#427) ORDER granting #426 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Attorney Janet Jones-Duffey representing E Trade Financial Corp (Consol Defendant), ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC (Consol Defendant), Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Consol Defendant), and ETrade Securities LLC (Consol Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#426) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Janet Jones-Duffey for / by E Trade Financial Corp, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Homer, Peter) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#425) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Robert K. Shelquist (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#424) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Robin Bronzaft Howald (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) Modified to correct last name on 10/21/2021 (mc). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#423) CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Rebecca A. Peterson (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
414 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Colorado Case Number 1:21-00290 Daniels v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of California Case Number 3:21-00167 Nordeen, et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Northern District of California Case Number 4:21-00693 Wieg v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 4:21-00696 Days v. Robinhood Markets, Inc., et al, 4:21-00697 Dalton v. Robinhood Securities, LLC, et al, 4:21-00758 Krasowski, et al v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 4:21-00759 Cezana v. Robinhood Financial LLC, et al, 4:21-00781 Cheng, et al v. Ally Financial Inc., et al, 4:21-00829 Curiel-Ruth v. Robinhood Securities LLC, et al, 4:21-00833 Freeney, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al. 4:21-00838 Krumenacker v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al, 4:21-00861 Moody, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California Case Number 2:21-00835 Kayali, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al, 2:21-00837 Gossett, et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC, et al with enclosed copy of the #1 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-80238-CMA with documents 1-17. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-20414 with documents 1-28. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 0:21-cv-60226-CMA with documents 1-15. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 0:21-cv-60220-CMA with documents 1-8. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (mc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 04/01/2021) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2989 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga. (Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair). (mc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITADEL LAW CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Securities, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Markets, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Robinhood Financial LLC is a litigant