This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/02/2021 at 08:20:33 (UTC).

In Re: J & M Sales Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 In Re J M Sales Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01270

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Appellant

The Timing Inc. doing business as La Vie 89

Debtor

J & M Sales Inc., et al.

Appellee

George L. Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Frederick Brian Rosner

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Zhao Liu

Attorney at Rosner Law Group, LLC

824 N. Market Street, Ste 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin J. Mangan

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jason Anthony Gibson

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Ronald S. Gellert

Attorney at Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC

1201 N. Orange Street, Suite 300

Wilmington, DE 19801

Amy D. Brown

Attorney at Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC

1201 N. Orange Street, Suite 300

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Opinion and Order on Appeal

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

#2

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by The Timing Inc. (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/6/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Counsel for Appellant shall initiate the call to chambers. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/1/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re The Timing Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Kevin J. Mangan. Attorney Frederick B. Rosner, Jason A. Gibson, and Zhao Liu terminated. (Mangan, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal by The Timing Inc.. (Mangan, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal by The Timing Inc.. (Mangan, Kevin) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re The Timing Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Kevin J. Mangan. Attorney Frederick B. Rosner, Jason A. Gibson, and Zhao Liu terminated. (Mangan, Kevin) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketORAL ORDER: The teleconference re: Mediation scheduled for 10/6/2021 at 09:30 AM is cancelled. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/5/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/6/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Counsel for Appellant shall initiate the call to chambers. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 10/1/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal filed by The Timing Inc. (Rosner, Frederick) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 9/30/21 by 4:00 p.m., the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Daniel Taylor, Law Clerk for Judge Thynge (#daniel_taylor@ded.uscourts.gov). Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/9/2021. (Taylor, Daniel) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (nmg) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (nmg) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (nmg) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 8/20/2021 by Judge John T. Dorsey in Bankruptcy case number 18-11801. Fee Status Paid.- filed by The Timing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Opinion and Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J & M Sales Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where The Timing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald S. Gellert