This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/03/2021 at 07:04:50 (UTC).

In Re: Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 In Re Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MD-02946

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexandra Uchenik

Martha Barabas

Austin Warman

Bruce Puleo

Mohammad Khalid

Campus Book Company, Inc.

CBSKY, Inc.

CBSNM, Inc.

Intervenor Plaintiff and Plaintiff

Martha Barabas

Defendants

McGraw Hill, LLC

Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C.

McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC

Cengage Learning, Inc.

Eric Pica

McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings, LLC

Barnes & Noble Education, Inc.

Pearson Education, Inc.

Follett Higher Education Group

Educational Publishers Enforcement Group

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Providers

Alexandra Pelletier

M. Samantha Pak

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert N. Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Marc Edelson

Attorney at Edelson Lechtzin LLP

3 Terry Drive, Ste 205

Newtown, PA 18940

John D. Radice

Attorney at Radice Law Firm, P.C.

475 Wall Street

Princeton, NJ 08540

Natasha Juanita Fernandez-Silber

Attorney at Radice Law Firm

475 Wall Street

Princeton, NJ 08540

Bradley Keith King

Attorney at AHDOOT & WOLFSON PC

10728 Lindbrook Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Daniel Evan Rubenstein

Attorney at Radice Law Firm, P.C.

475 Wall Street

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Neda Vegari

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Saul Benjamin Shapiro

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

William Francis Cavanaugh, Jr

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

William F. Cavanaugh

Michael Dockterman

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

227 West Monroe St., Suite 4700

Chicago, IL 60606

Christian Vandergeest

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Richard Sutton Snyder, Sr.

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer LLP

700 13Th St. Nw, 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Stephanie D. Edelson

Attorney at Riker, Danzig, Scherer, Hyland and Perretti

One Speedwell Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07960

Glenn A. Clark

Attorney at RIKER, DANZIG, SCHERER, HYLAND & PERRETTI, LLP

One Speedwell Avenue, Po Box 1981

Morristown, NJ 07092-1981

Andrew Ewalt

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

700 13Th Street Nw, Ste 10Th Floor

Washington Dc, DC 20005

Lee Albert

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

230 Park Avenue, Suite 530

New York, NY 10169

Jennifer Quinn-Barabanov

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

1330 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Linda G. Harvey

Attorney at GREENBERG, DAUBER, EPSTEIN & TUCKER, PC

One Gateway Center, Suite 600

Newark, NJ 07102-5311

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider Attorney

Keith J Verrier

Attorney at Levin Sedran & Berman LLP

510 Walnut Street, Ste 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

63 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#83

#54

#100

#78

#33

#32

#31

#29

#28

#125

#124

#122

#121

#120

#119

209 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketTerminate Transcript Deadlines (dt) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (54 in 1:20-cv-06314-DLC, 30 in 1:20-cv-06331-DLC, 28 in 1:20-cv-06335-DLC, 30 in 1:20-cv-06845-DLC, 25 in 1:20-cv-06848-DLC, 28 in 1:20-cv-06840-DLC, 26 in 1:20-cv-06334-DLC, 21 in 1:20-cv-06842-DLC, 24 in 1:20-cv-06333-DLC, 27 in 1:20-cv-06847-DLC, 127 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 51 in 1:20-cv-03162-DLC, 27 in 1:20-cv-06317-DLC, 90 in 1:20-cv-06364-DLC) Memorandum & Opinion,. in favor of Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Educational Publishers Enforcement Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., McGraw Hill LLC, McGraw Hill, LLC, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, McGraw-Hill Glogal Education Holdings, LLC, McGraw-Hill LLC, Pearson Education Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Eric Pica against BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Martha Barabas, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, Renttext.com, Inc., Alexandra Pelletier, Alexandra Uchenik, Austin Warman, Bruce Puleo, Cliff Urban, Donovan Mcgee, Elizabeth Kinskey, Eric Pica, Grace Kinskey, Jerry Gordon, Joan Padden, Julio Lopez, Kaitlyn Belen, Kira Cloonan, Kiyana Miller, M. Samantha Pak, Martha Barabas, Mohammad Khalid, Mohammed Khalid, TYLER ALIPERTO. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 14, 2021, the Defendants' January 22, 2021 motion to dismiss is granted; judgment is entered for the Defendants and the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/15/2021) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (dt) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: (83 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC, 126 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) Memorandum & Opinion, in favor of Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Educational Publishers Enforcement Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Follett Higher Education Group, Inc., McGraw Hill, LLC, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Eric Pica against BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc., Alexandra Uchenik, Bruce Puleo, Donovan Mcgee, Elizabeth Kinskey, Grace Kinskey, Jerry Gordon, Julio Lopez, Kaitlyn Belen, Kira Cloonan, Martha Barabas, Mohammad Khalid. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 14, 2021, the Defendants' January 22, 2021 motions to dismiss are granted; judgment is entered for the Defendants and the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 6/15/2021) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC (dt) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) OPINION AND ORDER: The Defendants' January 22, 2021 motion to dismiss is granted. The Clerk of Court shall close the case and enter judgment for the Defendants. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/14/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (nb) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) OPINION AND ORDER re: (87 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. filed by McGraw Hill, LLC, Cengage Learning, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, (78 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. filed by Pearson Education Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, (93 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss / NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE RETAILER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. filed by Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw Hill, LLC, Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Cengage Learning, Inc., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., (90 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss Student Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. filed by Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw Hill, LLC, Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Cengage Learning, Inc., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc.. The Defendants' January 22, 2021 motions to dismiss are granted. The Clerk of Court shall close the case and enter judgment for the Defendants. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/14/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC (nb) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Brian Schreiber on behalf of Pearson Education, Inc...(Schreiber, Zachary) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (93 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss / NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE RETAILER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. . Document filed by Follett Higher Education Group. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al..(Martin, Craig) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) DECLARATION of Michael Dockterman in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss Student Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw Hill, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Quinn-Barabanov, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #90 MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss Student Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Barnes & Noble College Booksellers L.L.C., Barnes & Noble Education, Inc., Cengage Learning, Inc., Follett Higher Education Group, McGraw Hill, LLC, Pearson Education, Inc...(Quinn-Barabanov, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (87 in 1:20-md-02946-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group., (78 in 1:20-cv-06339-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss Retailer Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Against Educational Publishers Enforcement Group. . Document filed by Cengage Learning, Inc., McGraw Hill, LLC, McGraw-Hill Global Education Holdings LLC, Pearson Education, Inc., Cengage Learning Inc., Pearson Education Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC, 1:20-cv-06339-DLC.(Shapiro, Saul) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
130 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from William F. Cavanaugh, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Publishers and Retailers dated August 21, 2020 re: proposed schedule pursuant to the Court's August 11, 2020. Document filed by McGraw Hill, LLC..(Cavanaugh, William) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Powers McCahill on behalf of Alexandra Uchenik..(McCahill, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert N. Kaplan dated 8/21/2020 re: propose schedule. Document filed by Alexandra Uchenik..(Kaplan, Robert) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Bruce W. Steckler dated August 21, 2020 re: Proposal for a Schedule, pursuant to Order dated August 11, 2020. Document filed by BJJ Corporation, CBSKY, Inc., CBSNM, Inc., Campus Book Company, Inc., Renttext.com, Inc...(Steckler, Bruce) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER MOTION to Expedite Proposing a Briefing Schedule for Consolidated Amended Complaint and Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Natasha J. Fernandez-Silber dated August 21, 2020. Document filed by Martha Barabas..(Fernandez-Silber, Natasha) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that by August 21, 2020, all parties in In Re: Inclusive Access Course Materials Antitrust Litigation, 20 MDL No. 2946; and Cabral v. Cengage Learning, Inc., et al, 20cv03660 shall submit proposals for a schedule in this litigation, in letters no longer than two pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a telephone conference will be held on September 3, 2020 at 2:30 P.M. The dial-in credentials for the telephone conference are the following: Dial-in: 888-363-4749 Access code: 4324948. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall use a landline if one is available. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02946-DLC et al. (jca) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sjo) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCASES ORIGINATING FROM THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK: 1:20-cv-03162 (DLC). (sjo) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sjo) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... transferring this action from the United States District Court - that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the District of Delaware, Illinois, New Jersey and New York, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Denise L. Cote, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/11/2020) (sjo) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Educational Publishers Enforcement Group is a litigant