This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2019 at 11:08:10 (UTC).

In re: Imerys Talc America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 In re Imerys Talc America, Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-MC-00103

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lanier Plaintiffs

Certain Talc Plaintiffs

Bart Harris and the Plaintiffs in the Consolidated Cases

Petitioners

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Debtor

Imerys Talc America, Inc., et al.

Respondent

Donna and Jerry Farra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark L. Desgrosseilliers

Attorney at Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP

1313 N. Market Street, Suite 5400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin Hroblak

Daniel A. Griffith

Attorney at Whiteford, Taylor & Preston, L.L.C.

Renaissance Centre, Suite 500, 405 King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801-3700

Marc R. Abrams

Attorney at Whiteford, Taylor & Preston, L.L.C.

Renaissance Centre, Suite 500, 405 King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801-3700

Shannon M. McNulty

Petitioner Attorneys

Patrick A. Jackson

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Steven K. Kortanek

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Rachel Farnsworth

Diane P. Sullivan

Marcia L. Goldstein

Ronit J. Berkovich

Alexander Condon

Respondent Attorney

Rick S. Miller

Attorney at Ferry Joseph, P.A.

824 Market St., Suite 1000, P.O. Box 1351

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

95 #1

Exhibit A

#95

87 #9

Exhibit 9

87 #7

Exhibit 7

87 #6

Exhibit 6

87 #5

Exhibit 5

87 #4

Exhibit 4

87 #3

Exhibit 3

87 #1

Exhibit 1

4 #18

Exhibit 18

4 #17

Exhibit 17

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

304 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Remark - D.I. 90 has been unsealed pursuant to D.I. #95 . (dlw) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits 2 and 8 with Respect to Lanier Law FirmPlaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Fix Venue by Lanier Plaintiffs re #87 Sur-Reply Brief, #90 Exhibit to a Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#94) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Wing Chan, Noticing Coordinator of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #64 Declaration, #77 Redacted Document, #66 Declaration filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 6/12/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#93) AFFIDAVIT of Forrest Kuffer, Noticing Coordinator, Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC re #76 Exhibit to a Document, #75 Exhibit to a Document, #70 Exhibit to a Document, #64 Declaration, #69 Exhibit to a Document, #67 Exhibit to a Document, #72 Exhibit to a Document, #73 Exhibit to a Document, #74 Exhibit to a Document, #77 Redacted Document, #66 Declaration, #68 Exhibit to a Document, #71 Exhibit to a Document filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 6/6/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#92) Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Davis Lee Wright, Counsel fot the Official Committee of Tort Claimants regarding Additional Supplemental Authorities - re #78 Letter, #46 Memorandum in Opposition, #1 MOTION to Change Venue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Wright, Davis) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#91) AFFIDAVIT of Michelle M. Dero re #87 Sur-Reply Brief, #89 Motion to Seal filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #89 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document: #87 Sur-Reply Brief // Exhibits 2 and 8 filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/5/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#90) EXHIBITS 2 and 8 re #87 Sur-Reply Brief by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark) Modified on 6/5/2019 (dlw). Modified on 6/27/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#89) Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document: #87 Sur-Reply Brief // Exhibits 2 and 8 - filed by Lanier Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, #2 Exhibit A - Proposed Form of Order)(Desgrosseilliers, Mark) Modified on 6/5/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#88) DECLARATION of Lean C. Kagan re #86 Sur-Reply Brief by Certain Talc Plaintiffs. (deBruin, David) Modified on 6/5/2019 (dlw). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Alexander Condon - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Rachel Farnsworth - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronit J. Berkovich - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Jackson, Patrick) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marcia L. Goldstein - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kortanek, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Diane P. Sullivan - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kortanek, Steven) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Remark: Case submitted for Judicial assignment. (lak) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of John J. Nolan, Esq. in support of Johnson & Johnson's and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s MOTION Fix Venue for Claims - related to Imery's Bankruptcy under 28 U.S.C. re #1 MOTION to Change Venue by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18) (lak) Modified on 4/18/2019 (rwc). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION of John H. Denton re #1 MOTION Fix Venue for Claims - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (lak) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 MOTION to Fix Venue for Claims filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/2/2019. (lak) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Fix Venue for Claims - filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rick S. Miller