This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 21:20:18 (UTC).

In Re Igor Shabanets et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 In Re Igor Shabanets was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00952

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Appellants and Debtors

Olga Shabanets

Igor Shabanets

Appellee

Richard A. Marshak

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Debtor Attorney

Bruce Allan Boice

Attorney at Law Office of Boice and Associates

307 East Chapman Avenue Suite 102

Orange, CA 92866

Appellee Attorneys

D Edward Hays

Attorney at Marshack Hays LLP

870 Roosevelt

Irvine, CA 92620

Tinho Mang

Attorney at Marshack Hays LLP

870 Roosevelt

Irvine, CA 92620

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court ORDERS that this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the Orders of the Court. The Court's Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues; Designation of Record; Notice of Transcript forwarded to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (jp) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#5

(#5) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Appellant is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than 7/12/2021, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court ORDERS that this action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the Orders of the Court. The Court's Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues; Designation of Record; Notice of Transcript forwarded to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (jp) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Appellant is hereby ordered to show cause in writing no later than 7/12/2021, why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 5/26/2021. (jtil) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellants Olga Shabanets and Igor Shabanets Re: Disbursement of funds on deposit with the Bankruptcy Courts registry entered on 5/14/2021 by Bankruptcy Judge Theodor C. Albert, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 5/24/2021. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:19-bk-14912, Adversary number: 8:20-ap-01002, BAP case number: N/A. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket) (jtil) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tinho Mang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D Edward Hays