This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:35:48 (UTC).

In Re Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 In Re Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02343

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

 

Party Details

Appellants and Debtors

Dr. Robert Amster

Your Neighborhood Urgent Care, LLC

Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc.

Robert Amster, M.D., Inc.

Hoag Urgent Care-Anaheim Hills, Inc.

Appellees

Newport Healthc are Center LLC

Hoag Memorial Hospital Presbyterian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Faye C Rasch

Attorney at Law Office of Faye Rasch

600 Stewart Street Suite 1300

Seattle, WA 98101

Appellee Attorneys

Randye B Soref

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Tanya Behnam

Attorney at Polsinelli LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

1 #1

BK Court Docket Sheets

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/4/2019. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #1 . (iv) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BANKRUPTCY APPEAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Appellant to show cause why these actions should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, Appellant may file the required NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT no later than JANUARY 27, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 2/14/2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#9

(#9) REPLY filed by Appellants Robert Amster, Hoag Urgent Care-Anaheim Hills, Inc., Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc., Robert Amster, M.D., Inc., Your Neighborhood Urgent Care, LLC to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #6 With Proof of Service (Rasch, Faye) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

1 #2

BK Court Docket Sheets 2

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: Order Granting Defendants' entered on 11/19/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Theodor C Albert, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/02/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:17-bk-13077-TA, Adversary number: 8:17-ap-01230-TA, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellants Your Neighborhood Urgent Care, LLC, Robert Amster, Robert Amster, M.D., Inc. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets, #2 BK Court Docket Sheets 2) (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Transcript forwarded to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY filed by Appellants Robert Amster, Hoag Urgent Care-Anaheim Hills, Inc., Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc., Robert Amster, M.D., Inc., Your Neighborhood Urgent Care, LLC to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #6 With Proof of Service (Rasch, Faye) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 2/14/2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment, #1 . (iv) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BANKRUPTCY APPEAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Appellant to show cause why these actions should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. In response to this Order to Show Cause, Appellant may file the required NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT no later than JANUARY 27, 2020. (iv) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Transcript forwarded to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 12/4/2019. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: Order Granting Defendants' entered on 11/19/2019 by Bankruptcy Judge Theodor C Albert, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 12/02/2019. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:17-bk-13077-TA, Adversary number: 8:17-ap-01230-TA, BAP case number: N/A., filed by appellants Your Neighborhood Urgent Care, LLC, Robert Amster, Robert Amster, M.D., Inc. (Attachments: #1 BK Court Docket Sheets, #2 BK Court Docket Sheets 2) (ghap) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.