This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2022 at 06:36:22 (UTC).

In re: Google Play Store Antitrust Litigation

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 In re Google Play Store Antitrust Litigation was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James Donato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-MD-02981

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Donato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jared Stark

Ashly Esquivel

Epic Games, Inc.

Robert Wing

Adan Moya

Brenda Keegan

Jennifer Grace

Coresa Trimble

Peekya App Services, Inc.

Alison Kavulak

Mary Carr

Dianne Bentley

Daniel Egerter

Brian McNamara

Daniel Carroll

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Alphabet Inc.

Google LLC

Google Payment Corp.

Google Commerce Limited

Google Ireland Limited

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

Epic Games, Inc.

71 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karin Bornstein Swope

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

999 N. Northlake Way, Suite 215

Seattle, WA 98103

James Lee Michaels

Attorney at Browne George Ross OBrien Annaguey & Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, 28Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jason Yuegin Kelly

Attorney at Ellis George Cipollone O'Brien Annaguey LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 30 Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Michael Anthony Acciavatti

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Robert A. Wallner

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Peggy Wedgworth

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Elizabeth Anne McKenna

Attorney at Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Samantha Stein

Attorney at Hausfeld, LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 3200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Steve W. Berman

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Dennis Stewart

Attorney at Gustafson Gluek PLLC

600 W. Broadway, Suite 3300

San Diego, CA 92101

Carol L. O'Keefe

Attorney at Korein Tillery

505 No 7Th St., Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63101

George Andrew Zelcs

Attorney at Korein Tillery LLC

205 N. Michigan Plaza, Suite 1950

Chicago, IL 60601

Randall P. Ewing, Jr.

Attorney at Korein Tillery

205 No. Michigan Ave., Suite 1950

Chicago, IL 60601

Adam J. Zapala

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Tamarah P. Prevost

Attorney at Cotchett Pitre McCarthy

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010

Elizabeth Tran Castillo

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre and McCarthy

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Mark Cotton Molumphy

Attorney at Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy LLP

840 Malcolm Road, Suite 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Other Attorneys

Hae Sung Nam

Attorney at Kaplan Fox and Kilsheimer LLP

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Robert F Lopez

Attorney at Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP

1301 Second Avenue, Suite 2000

Seattle, WA 98101

Sarah Jane Van Culin

Attorney at Saveri & Saveri, Inc

706 Sansome Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

211 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#320

(#320) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Cornillie (Cornillie, Henry) (Filed on 8/12/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#319

(#319) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/04/2022 before Judge James Donato by Humor Rainbow, Inc., Match Group, LLC, People Media, Inc., Plenty of Fish Media ULC, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 8/9/2022) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

#318

RESTRICTED

#317

(#317) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 8/4/2022. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#316

(#316) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/4/2022 before Judge James Donato by Consumer Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Nam, Hae Sung) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#315

(#315) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/04/2022 before Judge James Donato by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#314

(#314) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 4, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#313

(#313) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/04/2022 before Judge James Donato by State of Utah, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Ryther, Scott) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#312

(#312) NOTICE of Change of Address by Dennis Stewart (Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 8/4/2022) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

306 #4

Proposed Order

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#1

799 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#320) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Cornillie (Cornillie, Henry) (Filed on 8/12/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#319) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/04/2022 before Judge James Donato by Humor Rainbow, Inc., Match Group, LLC, People Media, Inc., Plenty of Fish Media ULC, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Dixon, Douglas) (Filed on 8/9/2022) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#318) Transcript of Proceedings held on August 4, 2022, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #313 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2022. (Related documents(s) #313 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022) (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#317) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 8/4/2022. (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#316) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/4/2022 before Judge James Donato by Consumer Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Nam, Hae Sung) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#315) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/04/2022 before Judge James Donato by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Byars, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#314) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 4, 2022 before Judge James Donato by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#313) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/04/2022 before Judge James Donato by State of Utah, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Ryther, Scott) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#312) NOTICE of Change of Address by Dennis Stewart (Stewart, Dennis) (Filed on 8/4/2022) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#311) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #306 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Response to Notice of Filing of Corrected Proposed Order Granting Consumer Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification re #304 Proposed Order, ) Consumer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Response to Notice of Filing of Corrected Proposed Order and Administrative Motion to Strike Unauthorized Sur-Reply filed byConsumer Plaintiffs. (Dallal, James) (Filed on 8/3/2022) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
303 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Transcript of Zoom Webinar Proceedings held on February 18, 2021, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #6 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2021. (Related documents(s) #6 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp.. (Rocca, Brian) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 18, 2021 before Judge James Donato by Google Asia Pacific PTE. Limited, Google Commerce Limited, Google Ireland Limited, Google LLC, Google Payment Corp., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Satia, Rishi) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 18, 2021 before Judge James Donato by Epic Games, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Even, Yonatan) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Status Conference held on 2/18/2021. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by MDL Panel on 2/17/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Consumer Plaintiffs. (Nam, Hae Sung) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Joint status statement due by 2/17/2021 at 12:00 p.m. Status Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Videoconference Only. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#2) ORDER. In light of the JPML's order transferring MDL No. 2981 to this Court, see Case No. 21-md-2981, Dkt. No. 1, the motion to dismiss hearing that was set for February 18, 2021, in Case Nos. 20-cv-5671 and 20-cv-5792, is vacated. The Court will hold an organizing conference for the MDL case to discuss coordinated motion proceedings and other case management issues. The conference will be held on February 18, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., by Zoom Webinar. The parties are directed to file by February 17, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. California time, a brief, joint statement advising the Court on the status of all litigation pending in this MDL matter, as well as the status of all potential tag-along cases. For the February 18 conference, each party or party group should designate a lead counsel to speak at the conference by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by February 17, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/11/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSFER ORDER by MDL Panel on 2/5/2021. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Google Ireland Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Google Payment Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Epic Games, Inc. is a litigant