This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2020 at 07:36:47 (UTC).

In re: G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 In re G L A D Enterprises, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01798

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

In Re and Appellant

G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC

Appellees

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Richard Coan

New Haven, CT 06511

George Wolf

Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company

Ocwen Loan Servicing

Not Classified By Court

US Trustee

150 Court St., Room 302

New Haven, CT 06510-7016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

In Re and Appellant Attorney

Kenneth Alan Beck

Attorney at Beck & Beck

83 Booth St.

Stratford, CT 06614

Appellee Attorneys

Sean P. Clark

Attorney at Kenny, Brimmer & Mahoney LLC

78 Beaver Road, Suite 2G

Wethersfield, CT 06109

Andrew Stephen Cannella

Attorney at Bendett & McHugh, PC

270 Farmington Avenue - Suite 171

Farmington, CT 06032

Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker

Attorney at Bendett & McHugh, P.C.

270 Farmington Ave. Suite 151

Farmington, CT 06032

Richard M. Coan

Attorney at Coan, Lewendon, Gulliver & Miltenberger

495 Orange St.

New Haven, CT 06511

Suzanne B. Sutton

Attorney at Cohen and Wolf, P.C.

657 Orange Center Road

Orange, CT 06477

Thomas A. Gugliotti

Attorney at Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, PC-Htfd

100 Pearl St., 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 231277

Hartford, CT 06123-1277

Adam B. Marks

Attorney at Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, PC-Htfd

100 Pearl St., 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 231277

Hartford, CT 06123-1277

Matthew Stiles

Attorney at Updike Kelly & Spellacy PC

100 Pearl Street, 17Th Floor, P.O. Box 231277

Hartford, CT 06103

Not Classified By Court Attorney

US Trustee

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office

150 Court St., Room 302

New Haven, CT 06510-7016

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

11 #6

Exhibit Statement of Issues for Appeal Doc. Id. No. 34 Case 19-50604

11 #5

Exhibit Notice of Appeal Id. No. 1 Case No. 19-05018

11 #4

Exhibit Memordum of Decision -Abstension and Dismissal

11 #3

Exhibit Adversary Complaint Case No. 19-05018

11 #2

Exhibit Schedules Doc. No. 19-50604

11 #1

Exhibit Docket Report Case No. 19-50604

#11

10 #6

Exhibit F

10 #5

Exhibit E

10 #4

Exhibit D

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint RESPONSE re #15 Objection, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC, #10 MOTION to Dismiss in Part the Appeal Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8013 filed by Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gugliotti, Thomas) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OBJECTION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC, #10 MOTION to Dismiss in Part the Appeal Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8013 filed by G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Beck, Kenneth) Modified on 1/3/2020 to amend docket text to reflect correct motions being opposed (Peterson, M). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC. Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 G.L.A.D. Enterprises' motion for an extension of time until 1/3/20 in which to respond to the motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/26/19. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/03/2020 to file Objection to Appellees Motion to Dismiss by G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC. (Beck, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for to Correct Response Deadline to ECF No. 10 Order by Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company. (Stiles, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing.Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Report Case No. 19-50604, #2 Exhibit Schedules Doc. No. 19-50604, #3 Exhibit Adversary Complaint Case No. 19-05018, #4 Exhibit Memordum of Decision -Abstension and Dismissal, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appeal Id. No. 1 Case No. 19-05018, #6 Exhibit Statement of Issues for Appeal Doc. Id. No. 34 Case 19-50604)(Clark, Sean) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss in Part the Appeal Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8013 by Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company.Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gugliotti, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE to counsel/parties regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne B. Sutton on behalf of George Wolf (Sutton, Suzanne) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Stiles on behalf of Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company , Appellee (Stiles, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/13/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/13/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 19-50604, filed by G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum #30) (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth Alan Beck