This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2020 at 08:24:49 (UTC).

In Re: George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 In Re George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin K. Hellerstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07257

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin K. Hellerstein

 

Party Details

Appellant

Tutor Perini Building Corporation

Debtor, In Re and Appellee

George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

Appellees and In Re

The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey

George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

New York City Regional Center George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Robert Nida

Attorney at Nida & Romyn, P.C.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorneys

Patrick George Rideout

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Christine Ada Okike

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Michael D. Sirota

Attorney at Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, Pa

900 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Rebecca W. G. Hollander

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C. (Hackensack)

25 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Mark Tsukerman

Attorney at Solo Practitioner

71 Kentucky Street

Long Beach, NY 11561

Ryan Thomas Jareck

Attorney at Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, P.A. (NJ)

25 Main Street, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

8 #9

Appendix part 10

8 #8

Appendix part 9

8 #7

Affidavit part 8

8 #6

Appendix part 7

8 #5

Appendix part 6

8 #4

Appendix part 5

8 #3

Appendix part 4

8 #2

Appendix part 3

8 #1

Appendix part 2

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPENDIX DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Tutor Perini Building Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix part 2, #2 Appendix part 3, #3 Appendix part 4, #4 Appendix part 5, #5 Appendix part 6, #6 Appendix part 7, #7 Affidavit part 8, #8 Appendix part 9, #9 Appendix part 10).(Nida, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Nida on behalf of Tutor Perini Building Corporation..(Nida, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corporation. Appellee Brief due by 11/25/2020..(Nida, Robert) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 10/26/2020. (bkar) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC. (bkar) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Tutor Perini Building Corporation. (bkar) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated August 14, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-B-13196 (SCC). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(bkar) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Port Authority of New York and New Jersey is a litigant

Latest cases where Tutor Perini Corporation, a Massachusetts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Nida