This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2020 at 09:23:43 (UTC).

In Re: George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 In Re George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alison J. Nathan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01324

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Appellant

Tutor Perini Building Corporation

Debtor, In Re and Appellee

George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

Appellees and In Re

Upper Manhattan Empowerment Zone Development Corporation

George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

GSNMF SUB-CDE 12 LLC

DVCI CDE XIII, LLC

George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC,

LIIF SUB-CDE XXVI, LLC

New York city Regional Center, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Kathryn Anne Coleman

Attorney at Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP (NY)

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Robert Nida

Attorney at Nida & Romyn, P.C.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorneys

Rishi Kapoor

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Michael D. Sirota

Attorney at Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, Pa

900 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Mark Tsukerman

Attorney at Solo Practitioner

71 Kentucky Street

Long Beach, NY 11561

Ryan Thomas Jareck

Attorney at Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, P.A. (NJ)

25 Main Street, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Lee S. Attanasio

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Sarah Goodfield

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 Seventh Ave.

New York, NY 10019

John J. Kuster

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP (NY)

787 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Lauren Marie Macksoud

Attorney at Thacher Profitt and Wood LLP (Two World Fin. Ctr)

Two World Financial Center

New York, NY 10281

David Lender

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

David Jonathan Cohen

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (NYC)

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Matthew Scott Barr

Attorney at Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

601 South Figueroa St.

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

19 #1

Appendix Volume ll of ll

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Kathryn A. Coleman dated March 30, 2020 re: Oral Argument. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corporation..(Coleman, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corporation..(Coleman, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Upper Manhattan Empowerment Zone Development Corporation. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/30/2020..(Kapoor, Rishi) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC,, New York city Regional Center, LLC. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume ll of ll).(Silbert, Gregory) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/30/2020..(Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Goodfield on behalf of GSNMF SUB-CDE 12 LLC..(Goodfield, Sarah) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Kuster on behalf of GSNMF SUB-CDE 12 LLC..(Kuster, John) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee New York city Regional Center, LLC..(bkar) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPENDIX DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Debtor George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume 2, #2 Appendix Volume 3, #3 Appendix Volume 4).(Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Debtor George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC..(Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Tutor Perini Building Corporation..(bkar) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Ryan T. Jareck, Esq. dated February 27, 2020 re: #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Kathryn A. Coleman dated February 26, 2020. . Document filed by George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC..(Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Gregory Silbert dated February 27, 2020 re: #5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Kathryn A. Coleman dated February 26, 2020. . Document filed by New York city Regional Center, LLC..(Silbert, Gregory) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Kathryn A. Coleman dated February 26, 2020. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corporation..(Coleman, Kathryn) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL and Statement of Issues re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Document filed by Appellant Tutor Perini Building Corporation. (bmlo) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER, The above case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that the appellant file its brief by March 2, 2020. The appellees shall file their opposition brief by March 16, 2020. The appellant's reply brief, if any, must be filed by March 30, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that at the time any reply is served, the appellant shall supply two courtesy copies of all papers to Chambers. SO ORDERED. (Appellant Brief due by 3/2/2020., Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/30/2020., Responses to Brief due by 3/16/2020) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/18/2020) (kv) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Shelley C. Chapman dated January 27, 2020. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-B-13196 (SCC). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(bkar) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Regional Center, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tutor Perini Corporation, a Massachusetts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Nida