This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:03:21 (UTC).

In Re: George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 In Re George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08069

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Appellant

Tutor Perini Building Corp.

In Re, Debtor and Appellee

George Washington Bridge Bus Station Development Venture LLC

Trustee

Kenneth P. Silverman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Robert Nida

Attorney at Nida & Romyn, P.C.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorneys

Mark Tsukerman

Attorney at Solo Practitioner

71 Kentucky Street

Long Beach, NY 11561

Michael D. Sirota

Attorney at Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, Pa

900 Third Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Rebecca W. G. Hollander

Attorney at Cole Schotz P.C. (Hackensack)

25 Main Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Ryan Thomas Jareck

Attorney at Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard, P.A. (NJ)

25 Main Street, Court Plaza North

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Trustee Attorney

Anthony Charles Acampora

Attorney at Silverman Acampora L.L.P.

100 Jericho Quadrangle, Suite 300

Jericho, NY 11753

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties as follows: The Trustee shall file and serve his brief by January 14, 2022. Appellant shall file its reply brief within 21 days after service of the Trustee's brief. This Stipulation is subject to the approval of the Court. Application granted. Appellee's brief is due no later than January 14, 2022. Appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 21 days after service of Appellee's brief. The Court directs the parties to comply in the future with the Court's Individual Rule 1(E). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 9. ( Appellee Brief due by 1/14/2022.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/24/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#9

(#9) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply /Appellee Brief addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Anthony C. Acampora and Robert Nida dated November 24, 2021. Document filed by Kenneth P. Silverman..(Acampora, Anthony) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

8 #7

Certificate of Service

8 #6

Appendix

8 #5

Appendix

8 #4

Appendix

8 #3

Appendix

8 #2

Appendix

8 #1

Appendix

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Charles Acampora on behalf of Kenneth P. Silverman..(Acampora, Anthony) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 11/26/2021..(bkar) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit 2 - Email from Jeff Margolin to Judge Chapman

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Email from Robert Swenson to Judge Chapman, with Exhibits

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ORDER: This appeal has been assigned to me for all purposes. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018, Appellant's brief must be served and filed by 30 days after the "docketing of notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically[,]" Appellee's brief must be served and filed within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief, and Appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of Appellee's brief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#3

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the parties as follows: The Trustee shall file and serve his brief by January 14, 2022. Appellant shall file its reply brief within 21 days after service of the Trustee's brief. This Stipulation is subject to the approval of the Court. Application granted. Appellee's brief is due no later than January 14, 2022. Appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 21 days after service of Appellee's brief. The Court directs the parties to comply in the future with the Court's Individual Rule 1(E). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 9. ( Appellee Brief due by 1/14/2022.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/24/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply /Appellee Brief addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Anthony C. Acampora and Robert Nida dated November 24, 2021. Document filed by Kenneth P. Silverman..(Acampora, Anthony) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp.. Appellee Brief due by 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Certificate of Service).(Nida, Robert) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Charles Acampora on behalf of Kenneth P. Silverman..(Acampora, Anthony) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RECORD OF APPEAL AVAILABILITY (COMPLETION). Re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. All Documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York have been filed with the U.S.D.C. S.D.N.Y. Record of Appeal is Complete and Available Electronically. Appellant Brief due by 11/26/2021..(bkar) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Trustee Kenneth P. Silverman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Robert Swenson to Judge Chapman, with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email from Jeff Margolin to Judge Chapman).(Krell, Justin) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: This appeal has been assigned to me for all purposes. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018, Appellant's brief must be served and filed by 30 days after the "docketing of notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically[,]" Appellee's brief must be served and filed within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief, and Appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of Appellee's brief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/30/2021) (rro) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellant Tutor Perini Building Corp..(bkar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge David S Jones dated August 25, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 19-B-13196 (DSJ). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Tutor Perini Building Corp...(bkar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where George Washington Bridge Bus Station and Infrastructure Development Fund, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tutor Perini Corporation, a Massachusetts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony C. Acampora