This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:10:07 (UTC).

In Re: Gary Evan Randall

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 In Re Gary Evan Randall was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Walter T. McGovern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-RD-00078

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Walter T. McGovern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Evan Randall

Bellevue, WA 98004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary E Randall

Attorney at TRUJILLO & PEICK, PS

10800 Ne 8Th St, Ste 304

Bellevue, WA 98004

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline disbarring Gary Evan Randall from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Changed admission status in ECF to disbarred. (DS) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Mail addressed to Gary Randall 10800 NE 8th STE 304, Bellevue, WA 98004 returned as Undeliverable/Unable to Forward re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#3

(#3) Mail addressed to 17311 135th Ave NE #B800C, Woodinveille, WA returned as Undeliverable/Moved Left no Forwarding Address re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Mailed Order to address on docket. (DS) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Disbarment Order, No. 201,908-1, disbarring Gary Evan Randall from the practice of law.(DS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (DS) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline disbarring Gary Evan Randall from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Changed admission status in ECF to disbarred. (DS) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail addressed to Gary Randall 10800 NE 8th STE 304, Bellevue, WA 98004 returned as Undeliverable/Unable to Forward re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Mail addressed to 17311 135th Ave NE #B800C, Woodinveille, WA returned as Undeliverable/Moved Left no Forwarding Address re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2020. Mailed Order to address on docket. (DS) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Disbarment Order, No. 201,908-1, disbarring Gary Evan Randall from the practice of law.(DS) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less