This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:46:18 (UTC).

In re: Frank William Birkholz

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 In re Frank William Birkholz was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Walter T. McGovern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-RD-00017

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Walter T. McGovern

 

Party Details

In Re

Frank W Birkholz

Seattle, WA 98154

Attorney/Law Firm Details

In Re Attorney

Frank William Birkholz

1001 4Th Ave, Suite 4400

Seattle, WA 98154

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #1 Order to Show Cause by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Mailed Order to address on docket. Reciprocal Discipline case closed.(DS) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE from The Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,955-2, Order Removing Attorney from Suspension Order. Mr. Birkholz reinstated to honorary status.(DS) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#1

(#1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Mailed Order to addresses on docket. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2020. (DS) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Suspension Order No. 201,955-2, Administrative Suspension for Failure to Comply with 2020 Licensing Requirements.(DS) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (DS) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #1 Order to Show Cause by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Mailed Order to address on docket. Reciprocal Discipline case closed.(DS) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE from The Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,955-2, Order Removing Attorney from Suspension Order. Mr. Birkholz reinstated to honorary status.(DS) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Mailed Order to addresses on docket. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2020. (DS) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE from the Washington State Supreme Court, Suspension Order No. 201,955-2, Administrative Suspension for Failure to Comply with 2020 Licensing Requirements.(DS) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less