This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2021 at 13:21:52 (UTC).

In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 In Re Fairfield Sentry Limited was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04400

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Appellant

Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation)

Appellees

ABN AMRO Schweiz AG

Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin)

Rothschild Lugano Dublin

Banca Arner SA

Compagnie Bancaire Helvetique

Dexia Banque Internationale Luxembourg SA

Verwaltungs und Privat-Bank AG Aktiengesellschaft (AMS)

Credit Suisse AG Zurich

Unifortune Conservative Side Pocket

UBS AG New York

NBK Banque Privee Suisse SA

Pictet & Cie

Centrum Bank AG (AMS)

PKB Privatbank AG

National Bank of Kuwait

Rothschild Bank Geneva (Dublin)

Lloyds TSB Bank Geneva

RBS Coutts Bank Ltd.

Liechtensteinische LB Reinvest AMS

45 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Marek Patrick Krzyzowski

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Ronald John Krock, II

Attorney at Selendy & Gay PLLC

1290 Avenue Of The Americas, New York

New York, NY 10104

Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Harris

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, L.L.P.

885 Third Avenue, Suite 1000

New York, NY 10022

John F. Zulack

Attorney at Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

111 Broadway, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Adam Michael Lavine

Attorney at Kobre & Kim LLP

800 Third Avenue, Ste 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Daniel Steven Shamah

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Carl Nicholas Wedoff

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP (NYC)

919 Third Avenue, 39Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Marshall Ross King

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Emil A. Kleinhaus

Attorney at Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

George Whitcomb Shuster

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP (Bos)

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Anthony L. Paccione

Attorney at Katten Muchin Rosenman, LLP (NYC)

575 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Other Attorneys

Scott Sonny Balber

Attorney at Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP

450 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10017

Kevin Charles Kelly

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP (NY)

1221 Avenue Of The Americas, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10020-1001

Joseph Michael Kay

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP (NYC)

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Andreas Albert Frischknecht

Attorney at Chaffetz Lindsey LLP

1700 Broadway, 33Rd Floor

New York, NY 10017

Andrew Mark Troop

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Jeffrey T. Scott

Attorney at Sullivan and Cromwell, LLP(NYC)

125 Broad Street

New York, NY 10004

Christine Marie Jordan

Attorney at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

One Liberty Plaza

New York, NY 10006

Erin Elaine Valentine

Attorney at Chaffetz Lindsey LLP

1700 Broadway, 33Rd Floor

New York, NY 10017

Keith Palfin

Attorney at SHEARMAN & STERLING LLP

801 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2634

37 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Liechtensteinische LB Reinvest AMS..(Preuss, Jascha) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent LGT Group Holding Ltd. for LGT Bank in Liechtenstein AG; Corporate Parent LGT Holding Denmark ApS, Copenhagen for Dresdner Bank Schweiz. Document filed by Dresdner Bank Schweiz, LGT Bank in Liechtenstein AG..(Preuss, Jascha) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell..(Molton, David) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-03911-VSB. (laq) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-03911-VSB. Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell..(Molton, David) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (bkar) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketBANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 19-cv-3911. (bkar) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(bkar) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Judgment of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated March 24, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-3635A, 10-B-13164 (CGM). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Greig Mitchell, Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F).(bkar) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin) is a litigant

Latest cases where Fairfield Sentry Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where National Bank of Kuwait SAK is a litigant