This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2021 at 12:13:22 (UTC).

In Re Eagan Avenatti LLP

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 In Re Eagan Avenatti LLP was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Otis D. Wright, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

 

Party Details

Appellants

Sandy Le

Filippo Marchino

Young Blue LLC

Elba Hernandez

The X-Law Group, P.C.

Debtor

Eagan Avenatti LLP

Appellee

Richard A. Marshack

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Filippo Marchino

Attorney at The X-Law Group PC

625 Fair Oaks Avenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030-5817

Thomas Edward Gray

Attorney at The X-Law Group PC

625 Fair Oaks Avenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Kurt Ernest Kates Ramlo

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David B Golubchik

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Appellee Attorneys

D Edward Hays

Attorney at Marshack Hays LLP

870 Roosevelt

Irvine, CA 92620

Tinho Mang

Attorney at Marshack Hays LLP

870 Roosevelt

Irvine, CA 92620

Richard L Kellner

Attorney at Kellner Law Group PC

1180 South Beverly Drive Suite 610

Los Angeles, CA 90035

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 4/26/2021. (lc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 (lc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Appellants Elba Hernandez, Sandy Le, Filippo Marchino, The X-Law Group, P.C., Young Blue LLC, (Ramlo, Kurt) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. USDC assigned case number MISSING In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Appellants Elba Hernandez, Sandy Le, Filippo Marchino, The X-Law Group, P.C., Young Blue LLC, (Ramlo, Kurt) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Certification of Interested Parties was not submitted in accordance with Rule 2.1 of the Local Rules Governing Bankruptcy Appeals, Cases, and Proceedings (Chapter IV). forwarded to Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 2/19/2021. (car) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO DISMISS; AMENDED AMENDED ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION TO DISMISS entered on 2/4/2021 and 2/5/2021 by Bankruptcy Judge Scott C Clarkson, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 2/17/2021. Bankruptcy Court case number: 8:19-bk-13560-SC, Adversary number: 8:20-ap-01086-SC, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellants Elba Hernandez, Young Blue LLC, The X-Law Group, P.C., Filippo Marchino, Sandy Lee. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eagan Avenatti LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where X Law Group PC is a litigant

Latest cases where YOUNG BLUE LLC. A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard L Kellner