This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2019 at 07:17:04 (UTC).

In re: Douglas N Woods

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 In re Douglas N Woods was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M McCool and Walter T. McGovern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-RD-00051

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

William M McCool

Walter T. McGovern

 

Party Details

Defendant

Douglas N Woods

Auburn, WA 98092-3288

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Douglas N. Woods

Attorney at THE WOODS LAW OFFICE, PLLC

415 First St. Ne, Ste A

Auburn, WA 98002

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Mail addressed to 415 First St., NE, STE A, Auburn, WA 98002 returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2019. Order mailed to addresses on docket.(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Suspension from the Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,854-8, Administrative Suspension of Attorneys for Failure to Comply with 2019 Licensing Requirements.(DS) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline suspending Douglas N Woods from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Changed admission status in ECF to suspended. Mailed Order to address on docket. (DS) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (DS) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER of Reciprocal Discipline suspending Douglas N Woods from the practice of law before this Court by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Order e-mailed to Clerk of US District Court, EDWA, Clerk of US Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Clerk of US Bankruptcy Court, WDWA and WSBA. Changed admission status in ECF to suspended. Mailed Order to address on docket. (DS) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Mail addressed to 415 First St., NE, STE A, Auburn, WA 98002 returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Show Cause. (DS) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Walter T. McGovern. Show Cause Response due by 7/15/2019. Order mailed to addresses on docket.(DS) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge Walter T. McGovern added. (PS) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Clerk William M McCool no longer assigned to case. (PS) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Suspension from the Supreme Court of Washington, Order No. 201,854-8, Administrative Suspension of Attorneys for Failure to Comply with 2019 Licensing Requirements.(DS) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.