This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2020 at 11:38:59 (UTC).

In re DMCA Subpoena to Reddit, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 In re DMCA Subpoena to Reddit, Inc was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-MC-80044

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Activision Publishing, Inc.

Defendant

Reddit, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Aaron D Johnston

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3120

Marc E. Mayer

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

11377 W Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Receipt

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Subpoena Issued as to Reddit, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Marc E. Mayer in Support of #1 REQUEST for Subpoena to Reddit, Inc. filed by Activision Publishing, Inc. (Related document(s) #1 ) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST for Subpoena to Reddit, Inc. Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 512(h) by Activision Publishing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Receipt 34611147579, $47.00). (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDDIT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ACTIVISION PUBLISHING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc Ellis Mayer