This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 12:46:43 (UTC).

In Re: DMCA 512(h) subpoena to Travia Network

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 In Re DMCA 512 h subpoena to Travia Network was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-MC-80098

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tokyo Broadcasting System Television, Inc.

In Re

In Re: DMCA 512(h) subpoena to Travia Network

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nancy Evelyn Wolff

Attorney at Cowan DeBaets Abrahams and Sheppard LLP

9454 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 901

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Declaration of Nancy E. Wolff in Support of #1 Request for the Clerk for the Issuance of a Subpoena filed by Tokyo Broadcasting System Television, Inc. (Related document(s) #1 ) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

1 #1

Receipt

#1

(#1) Request for the Clerk for the Issuance of a Subpoena filed by Tokyo Broadcasting System Television, Inc. Responses due by 5/6/2021. Replies due by 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Declaration of Nancy E. Wolff in Support of #1 Request for the Clerk for the Issuance of a Subpoena filed by Tokyo Broadcasting System Television, Inc. (Related document(s) #1 ) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Request for the Clerk for the Issuance of a Subpoena filed by Tokyo Broadcasting System Television, Inc. Responses due by 5/6/2021. Replies due by 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Evelyn Wolff