This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2022 at 11:11:31 (UTC).

In Re Debtor: Crestlloyd, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/20/2022 In Re Debtor Crestlloyd, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02677

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

George H. Wu

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

 

Party Details

Appellant

Inferno Investment, Inc.

Appellees

Yogi Securities, LLC

J and E Texture, Inc.

American Truck and Tool Rentals Inc.

Richard Saghian

Nile Niami

Italian Luxury Group, LLC, and Italian Luxury Design, LLC

Yvonne Niami

Hankey Capital

In Re

Crestlloyd, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Kyra E Andrassy

Attorney at Smiley Wang-Ekvall LLP

3200 Park Center Drive Suite 250

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Sharon Oh-Kubisch

Attorney at Smiley Wang-Ekvall LLP

3200 Park Center Drive Suite 250

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Appellee Attorneys

Mark Shinderman

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William John Schumacher

Attorney at Milbank LLP

2029 Century Park East, 33Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jennifer L. Kneeland

Attorney at Watt Tieder Hoffar and Fitzgerald LLP

1765 Greensboro Station Place Suite 1000

Mclean, VA 22102

Jane G. Kearl

Attorney at Watt Tieder Hoffar and Fitzgerald LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

Marguerite Lee DeVoll

Attorney at Watt Tieder Hoffar and Fitzgerald LLP

1765 Greensboro Station Place, Suite 1000

Mclean, VA 22102

Leonard M Shulman

Attorney at Shulman Bastian LLP

100 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92618

Ryan Daniel O'Dea

Attorney at Shulman Bastian Friedman & Bui LLP

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92618

Genevieve G Weiner

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West 5Th Street Floor 40

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Amy P. Lally

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars 17Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Samuel A Newman

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Hamid R Rafatjoo

Attorney at Raines Feldman LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gregory J Morrow

Attorney at Morrow Law Group

10401 Wilshire Boulevvard Suite 1102

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Mark S Horoupian

Attorney at SulmeyerKupetz APC

333 South Hope Street Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1406

Thomas Michael Geher

Attorney at Jeffer Mangels Butler and Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4308

In Re Attorneys

David B Golubchik

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Golubchik LLP

2818 La Cienega Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90034

Todd M Arnold

Attorney at Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Golubchik LLP

2818 La Cienega Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90034

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On June 29, 2022, Appellant Inferno Investment, Inc. and Appellees Crestlloyd, LLC, Yogi Securities Holdings, LLC, Richard Saghian, Nile Niami, Italian Luxury Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal #15 . The Parties state that the remaining two parties identified as Appellees on the docket, J&E Textures, Inc. and American Truck & Tool Rentals, Inc., have liens that have been paid in full by the consent of the parties and no longer have any interest in the outcome of the appeal. The Court ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this appeal are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES the appeal with each party to bear its ownattorney's fees and costs in connection with the appeal. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

15 #1

Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: " MOTION" to dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal by Inferno Investment, Inc. #12 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. Other: Refer to docket no. #13 . (lc) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal Filed by Inferno Investment, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023; with Proof of Service #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Dismiss Case. Other error(s) with document(s): pdf is Not a Motion, but a Stipulation. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-02091 FLA. Case transferred from Judge George H. Wu to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02677 FLA. Signed by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha (rn) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 6/23/2022. (lom) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 ; Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) #2 ; Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form #4 ; Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal) #8 . (lom) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY BY US BANKRUPTCY COURT regarding The following documents and/or filing fee, as indicated below, were not filed on the above-captioned appeal as required by FRBP 8003 and 8009: re Notice of Transcript(s) forwarded to Judge George H. Wu. (lom) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#7

(#7) OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #6 Notice of Opposition to Notice of Related Cases filed by Appellee Nile Niami. (Rafatjoo, Hamid) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellee Crestlloyd, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-02091-FLA; 2:22-cv-02487-MEMF (Arnold, Todd) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge George H. Wu. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 04/12/2022. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

1 #1

Bankruptcy Docket Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On June 29, 2022, Appellant Inferno Investment, Inc. and Appellees Crestlloyd, LLC, Yogi Securities Holdings, LLC, Richard Saghian, Nile Niami, Italian Luxury Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal #15 . The Parties state that the remaining two parties identified as Appellees on the docket, J&E Textures, Inc. and American Truck & Tool Rentals, Inc., have liens that have been paid in full by the consent of the parties and no longer have any interest in the outcome of the appeal. The Court ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this appeal are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES the appeal with each party to bear its ownattorney's fees and costs in connection with the appeal. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023 filed by Attorneys for Inferno Investment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andrassy, Kyra) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: " MOTION" to dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal by Inferno Investment, Inc. #12 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The document is stricken. Other: Refer to docket no. #13 . (lc) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal Filed by Inferno Investment, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023; with Proof of Service #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Dismiss Case. Other error(s) with document(s): pdf is Not a Motion, but a Stipulation. Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal ; Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal Filed by Inferno Investment, Inc. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8023; with Proof of Service filed by Attorneys for Inferno Investment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Andrassy, Kyra) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:22-cv-02091 FLA. Case transferred from Judge George H. Wu to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-02677 FLA. Signed by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha (rn) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 6/23/2022. (lom) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment #1 ; Notice of Referral of Appeal (Adversary) #2 ; Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form #4 ; Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal) #8 . (lom) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY BY US BANKRUPTCY COURT regarding The following documents and/or filing fee, as indicated below, were not filed on the above-captioned appeal as required by FRBP 8003 and 8009: re Notice of Transcript(s) forwarded to Judge George H. Wu. (lom) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) OBJECTIONS to Notice of Related Case(s) #6 Notice of Opposition to Notice of Related Cases filed by Appellee Nile Niami. (Rafatjoo, Hamid) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Appellee Crestlloyd, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-02091-FLA; 2:22-cv-02487-MEMF (Arnold, Todd) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge George H. Wu. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT filed by Appellant Inferno Investment, Inc. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 04/12/2022. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL AND STATEMENT OF ELECTION: Re: Order Granting Debtor's Motion for an Order: (1) Approving the Sale of the Debtor's Real Property Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances, and Interests, with the Exception of Enumerated Exclusions; (2) Finding that the Buyer is a Good Faith Purchaser; (3) Authorizing and Approving the Payment of Certain Claims from Sale Proceeds; (4) Waiving the Fourteen-Day Stay Period Set Forth in Bankruptcy Rule 6004(h); and (5) Providing Related Relief entered on 03/28/2022 by Bankruptcy Judge Deborah J. Saltzman, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 04/11/2022. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:21-bk-18205-DS, Adversary number: N/A, BAP case number: CC-22-1077, filed by Appellant Inferno Investment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (sh) Modified on 4/22/2022 (sh). (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFERNO INVESTMENT INC. A QUEBEC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where YOGI SECURITIES HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant