This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2021 at 07:09:50 (UTC).

In re Debtor Art And Architecture Books Of The 21st Century

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 In re Debtor Art And Architecture Books Of The 21st Century was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Holcomb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06006

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Sam Leslie

Ace Gallery New York Corporation

Ace Gallery New York, Inc.

Ace Museum

Douglas Chrismas

Petitioner and Intervenor Plaintiff

Raymond Pettibon

Debtor and Respondent

Art And Architecture Books Of The 21st Century

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Ace Gallery New York Corporation

Ace Gallery New York, Inc.

Ace Museum

Douglas Chrismas

Jennifer Kellen

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Defendant

Douglas Chrismas

Cross Claimant

400 S. La Brea, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason Daniel Balitzer

Attorney at SulmeyerKupetz APC

333 South Hope Street 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1406

Victor A Sahn

Attorney at SulmeyerKupetz APC

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1406

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alan W Forsley

Attorney at Fredman Lieberman Pearl LLP

1875 Century Park East, Suite 2230

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jonathan S Shenson

Attorney at Shenson Law Group PC

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Cross Claimant Attorneys

Brian Leslie Davidoff

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 21St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4590

Keith Patrick Banner

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 21St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4590

Ronald Rus

Attorney at Brown Rudnick LLP

2211 Michelson Drive 7Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE That No Objections Have Been Filed To The Bankruptcy Court's Report and Recommendation Granting Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff-In-Intervention Raymond Pettibon. (Zur, Roye) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-08027 JWH. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-06006 JWH. Signed by Judge John W. Holcomb (rn) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff-In-Intervention Raymond Pettibon. Related Case(s): 2:19- cv-08027-JWH (Zur, Roye) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Referral of Bankruptcy Matter (CV-64), #1 , Report and Recommendation (Issued) #2 e-mailed to jbalitzer@sulmeyerlaw.com bounced due to 50 5.7.360 Remote server returned message denied by administrative policy -> 550 Administrative prohibition - envelope blocked - https://community.mimecast.com/docs/DOC-1369#550 [0vs8b3m4PESNJ1F9WIR-Cw.us544]. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the United States Bankruptcy Court Re Motion of Raymond Pettibon for Summary Judgment of His Complaint in Intervention and Grant Motion for Summary Judgment, #1 . (jtil) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF BANKRUPTCY MATTER: Re: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re: Motion of Raymond Pettibon for Summary Judgment on His Complaint in Intervention and Grant the Motion for Summary Judgment entered on 7/21/2021 by Bankruptcy Judge Robert Kwan, received and assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Bankruptcy Court case number: 2:13-bk-14135, Adversary number: 2:15-ap-01679, BAP case number: N/A (jtil) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Art and Architecture Books of the 21st Century is a litigant

Latest cases where 400 S. LA BREA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant