This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2021 at 08:54:03 (UTC).

In re: Cullen J. Bond

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 In re Cullen J Bond was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. McGlynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01178

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. McGlynn

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Deighan Law LLC d/b/a Upright Law

Cullen J. Bond

Respondent

Nancy J. Gargula

Interested Party

US Bankruptcy Clerk

750 Missouri Avenue

East St. Louis, IL 62201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Charles A. Armgardt

Attorney at Deighan Law LLC

79 W. Monroe Street, Suite 1006

Chicago, IL 60603

Mark T. Lavery

Attorney at Mark T. Lavery, Esq.

8926 N. Greenwood

Niles, IL 60714

James E. Ford

Attorney at Law Offices of James E. Ford

1103 Public Square, P.O. Box 272

Benton, IL 62812

Respondent Attorney

Mark D. Skaggs

Attorney at USDOJ - Office of the U.S. Trustee - Peoria, IL

401 Main Street, 1100 Becker Building

Peoria, IL 61602-1241

Interested Party Attorney

US Bankruptcy Clerk

Attorney at US Bankruptcy Court

750 Missouri Avenue

East St. Louis, IL 62201

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Oral Argument on Motion to Withdraw Reference by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

2 #1

BK Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference

#2

(#2) MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Cullen J. Bond, Deighan Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 BK Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference)(kls3) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE that pursuant to the Order of Consolidation, all future filings shall be filed in the master case only. All future pleadings shall bear case number 20-cv-1176-SPM Associated Cases: 3:20-cv-01176-SPM, 3:20-cv-01178-SPM, 3:20-cv-01179-SPM, 3:20-cv-01180-SPM, 3:20-cv-01181-SPM, 3:20-cv-01182-SPM, 3:20-cv-01183-SPM, 3:20-cv-01184-SPM, 3:20-cv-01185-SPM, 3:20-cv-01186-SPM, 3:20-cv-01187-SPM, 3:20-cv-01189-SPM, 3:20-cv-01190-SPM, 3:20-cv-01192-SPM, 3:20-cv-01193-SPM, 3:20-cv-01194-SPM, 3:20-cv-01195-SPM, 3:20-cv-01196-SPM, 3:20-cv-01197-SPM, 3:20-cv-01198-SPM, 3:20-cv-01199-SPM, 3:20-cv-01200-SPM, 3:20-cv-01201-SPM, 3:20-cv-01202-SPM, 3:20-cv-01203-SPM, 3:20-cv-01204-SPM, 3:20-cv-01205-SPM, 3:20-cv-01207-SPM, 3:20-cv-01208-SPM, 3:20-cv-01209-SPM, 3:20-cv-01210-SPM, 3:20-cv-01211-SPM, 3:20-cv-01212-SPM, 3:20-cv-01213-SPM, 3:20-cv-01214-SPM(jlrr)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases in lead case 20-1176. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 12/21/2020.(jsm2)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Oral Argument on Motion to Withdraw Reference by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Deighan Law LLC. (Lavery, Mark) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Cullen J. Bond, Deighan Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 BK Transmittal of Withdrawal of Reference)(kls3) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stephen P. McGlynn assigned. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-1178-SPM. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (kls3) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bankruptcy Clerk is a litigant

Latest cases where Deighan Law LLC is a litigant