This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 08:16:17 (UTC).

In re: Channer

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 In re Channer was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kari A. Dooley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00319

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kari A. Dooley

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

Lorna Y. Channer

Windsor, CT 06095

Appellee

Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency

Interested Party

Bonnie Mangan

Not Classified By Court

US Trustee

150 Court St., Room 302

New Haven, CT 06510-7016

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

Elizabeth J. Austin

Attorney at Pullman & Comley - Bpt

850 Main St., Po Box 7006

Bridgeport, CT 06601-7006

Not Classified By Court Attorney

US Trustee

Attorney at U.S. Trustee Office

150 Court St., Room 302

New Haven, CT 06510-7016

 

Court Documents

12 #2

certificate of service

12 #1

Appendix

#12

(#12) Brief of Appellant by Lorna Y. Channer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#11

(#11) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#10

(#10) Transmission of Supplemental Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#9

(#9) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Objection to Refusal to Transmit Relevant Records on Appeal filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Lorna Y. Channer. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE to counsel regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#6

(#6) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#5

(#5) Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/3/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/4/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#2

(#2) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

1 #1

Order #115

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 10-21232, filed by Lorna Y. Channer. (Attachments: #1 Order #115)(Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Brief of Appellant by Lorna Y. Channer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Transmission of Supplemental Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Objection to Refusal to Transmit Relevant Records on Appeal filed in the U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Lorna Y. Channer. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE to counsel regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 4/2/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/3/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/4/2019. (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 10-21232, filed by Lorna Y. Channer. (Attachments: #1 Order #115)(Fanelle, N.) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less