This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2021 at 08:51:10 (UTC).

In Re Changyou.com Limited Securities Litigation

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 In Re Changyou com Limited Securities Litigation was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory H. Woods. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07858

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory H. Woods

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ODS Capital LLC

Defendants

Changyou.com Limited

Sohu.com Limited

Sohu.com (Game) Limited

Xiao Chen

Dr. Charles Zhang

Joanna Lv

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jake Bissell-Linsk

140 Broadway

New York, NY 10005

Carol Cecilia Villegas

Attorney at Labaton & Sucharow LLP (NYC)

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Jake E. Bissell-Linsk

Attorney at Labaton & Sucharow LLP (NYC)

140 Broadway, 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

David J Schwartz

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway

New Yor, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Richard J. Rosensweig

Attorney at Goulston & Storrs, P.C

400 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02110

Abigail Fletes

Attorney at Goulston & Storrs

400 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02110

Jennifer Mikels

Attorney at Goulston & Storrs, P.C

400 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02110

Nicholas Cutaia

Attorney at Goulston & Storrs PC

885 Third Avenue, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Scott D. Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Michael Charles Griffin

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Robert Alexander Fumerton

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

 

Court Documents

43 #3

Text of Proposed Order

43 #2

Certificates of Good Standing

43 #1

Affidavit

43 #43

Main Document

40 #3

Text of Proposed Order

40 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

40 #1

Affidavit

40 #40

Main Document

39 #3

Text of Proposed Order

#2

1 #7

Proposed Summons

1 #6

Proposed Summons

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER granting #43 Motion for Jennifer Mikels to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #43 MOTION for Jennifer Mikels to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25317793. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION for Jennifer Mikels to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25317793. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Changyou.com Limited, Joanna Lv, Sohu.com (Game) Limited, Sohu.com Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Mikels, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER granting #40 Motion for Abigail Fletes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #39 Motion for Richard J. Rosensweig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (wv) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Abigail Fletes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25205261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Richard J. Rosensweig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25205252. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION for Abigail Fletes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25205261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Changyou.com Limited, Joanna Lv, Sohu.com (Game) Limited, Sohu.com Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Fletes, Abigail) (Entered: 10/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION for Richard J. Rosensweig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25205252. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Changyou.com Limited, Joanna Lv, Sohu.com (Game) Limited, Sohu.com Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rosensweig, Richard) (Entered: 10/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #20 Amended Complaint, against Changyou.com Limited, Xiao Chen, Joanna Lv, Sohu.com (Game) Limited, Sohu.com Limited, Charles Zhang with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by ODS Capital LLC. Related document: #20 Amended Complaint,..(Villegas, Carol) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by ODS Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David J. Schwartz, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Notice, #5 Exhibit C - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #6 Proposed Order) (Schwartz, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint,, by ODS Capital LLC (Schwartz, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketYour proposed summonses were not issued for the following reason: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint,, by ODS Capital LLC (Schwartz, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Changyou Merger Co. Limited, Changyou.com Limited, Xiao Chen, Joanna Lv, Sohu.com (Game) Limited, Sohu.com Limited, Charles Zhang filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-13802645 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by ODS Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons) (Schwartz, David) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 9/21/2021.] (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ODS Capital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard J. Rosensweig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Cutaia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Alexander Fumerton Esq.