This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2019 at 07:38:19 (UTC).

In Re: Cangiano

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 In Re Cangiano was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles S. Haight, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00169

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles S. Haight, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Luigi Cangiano

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Charles Edmund Murphy

Attorney at Lennon Murphy & Lennon

2425 Post Road, Suite 302

Southport, CT 06890

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) EXHIBIT Ad Interim Security for Value per Order Dated 03/21/2019 [Doc. 5] by Luigi Cangiano re #1 Complaint,. (Murphy, Charles) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PETITION FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY Signed by Clerk on 3/21/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit NOTICE of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability

#5

(#5) ORDER (see attached) Approving Security, Directing Issue of Notice, Restraining Suits, and Directing Filing of Claims. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 21, 2019. (Attachment: NOTICE of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability). (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Luigi Cangiano, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 2/5/19.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2019 Discovery due by 8/7/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

1 #4

Text of Proposed Order

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Petition

1 #2

Exhibit Ad Interim Security

1 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Value

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against All Parties ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5146777.), filed by Luigi Cangiano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Value, #2 Exhibit Ad Interim Security, #3 Exhibit Notice of Petition, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Charles) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBIT Ad Interim Security for Value per Order Dated 03/21/2019 [Doc. 5] by Luigi Cangiano re #1 Complaint,. (Murphy, Charles) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF PETITION FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY Signed by Clerk on 3/21/2019.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER (see attached) Approving Security, Directing Issue of Notice, Restraining Suits, and Directing Filing of Claims. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on March 21, 2019. (Attachment: NOTICE of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability). (Dorais, L.) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Luigi Cangiano, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 2/5/19.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2019 Discovery due by 8/7/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/5/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against All Parties ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5146777.), filed by Luigi Cangiano. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Value, #2 Exhibit Ad Interim Security, #3 Exhibit Notice of Petition, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Charles) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.