This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2022 at 07:53:57 (UTC).

In re: Brammer Bio, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 In re Brammer Bio, LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Tony N. Leung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-MC-00043

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tony N. Leung

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation

Respondent

Brammer Bio, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Britta S Loftus

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C.

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Devan V Padmanabhan

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson PLLC

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Sri K Sankaran

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C.

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Michelle E Dawson

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C.

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Erin O. Dungan

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C.

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Mariah L Reynolds

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson PLLC

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Paul J Robbennolt

Attorney at Padmanabhan & Dawson, P.L.L.C.

45 South 7Th Street, Suite 2315

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Respondent Attorneys

Lora Mitchell Friedemann

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, PA

200 S 6Th St Ste 4000

Mpls, MN 55402-1425

Brian P Egan

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht and Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jack Blumenfeld

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht and Tunnell

1201 N Market St, Po Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

Kelsey McElveen

Attorney at Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.

200 South 6Th Street, Suite 4000

Minneapolis, MN 55402-1425

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) STIPULATION Regarding Wilson Wolf's Motion to Compel Brammer Bio to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects in Response to Subpoena by Brammer Bio, LLC. Jointly Signed by Wilson Wolf. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION Regarding Docket #1 Wilson Wolf Corp's Motion to Compel Brammer to Produce Document, Information, or Objects in Response to Subpoena by Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. Jointly Signed by Brammer. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#18

(#18) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jack B. Blumenfeld. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9671765 filed by Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian P. Egan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9671740 filed by Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey McElveen on behalf of Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lora Mitchell Friedemann on behalf of Brammer Bio, LLC. (Friedemann, Lora) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL BRAMMER BIO, LLC TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS IN RESPONSE TO SUBPOENA Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

4 #2

Exhibit 11-12

4 #1

Exhibit 1-9

4 #4

Main Document

#3

REQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. numbers #1 , #3 and #4 . (lih) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #20 & #21 Stipulation & Cancelling Hearing. In light of the parties' #20 & #21 Stipulation, Petitioner's #1 Motion to Compel is WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The #13 8/22/2022 motion hearing on Petitioner's #1 Motion to Compel is CANCELLED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/16/2022. (KLN) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION Regarding Wilson Wolf's Motion to Compel Brammer Bio to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects in Response to Subpoena by Brammer Bio, LLC. Jointly Signed by Wilson Wolf. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION Regarding Docket #1 Wilson Wolf Corp's Motion to Compel Brammer to Produce Document, Information, or Objects in Response to Subpoena by Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. Jointly Signed by Brammer. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian P Egan for Brammer Bio, LLC.; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jack Blumenfeld for Brammer Bio, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/3/2022. (KMO) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jack B. Blumenfeld. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9671765 filed by Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian P. Egan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9671740 filed by Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey McElveen on behalf of Brammer Bio, LLC. (McElveen, Kelsey) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Lora Mitchell Friedemann on behalf of Brammer Bio, LLC. (Friedemann, Lora) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL BRAMMER BIO, LLC TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS, INFORMATION, OR OBJECTS IN RESPONSE TO SUBPOENA Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2022 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Padmanabhan, Devan) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.), please submit to the Clerk's Office a copy of D.I. numbers #1 , #3 and #4 . (lih) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • Docket(#6) ORAL ORDER: The case is now REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/30/2022. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Exhibits that were previously attached to D.I. #1 have been removed and added to the declaration at D.I. #4 (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation's Motion To Compel Brammer Bio, LLC To Produce Documents, Information, Or Objects In Response To Subpoena, Memorandum and Declaration in Support of Motion served on Registered Agent - Capitol Service, Inc. on 06/27/2022, filed by Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. (McGivney, Peter) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRemark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Sri K. Sankaran in Support of D.I. #1 MOTION to Compel by Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. (apk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2022: #1 Exhibit 1-9, #2 Exhibit 11-12, #3 Exhibit 14-16) (apk). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM in Support of D.I. #1 MOTION to Compel filed by Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/7/2022. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Compel Brammer Bio, LLC to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects in Response to Subpoena - filed by Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk)(Filing Fee Paid: ADEDC-3901833) Modified on 6/28/2022 (apk). [Transferred from Delaware on 7/15/2022.] (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilson Wolf Manufacturing Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lora Mitchell Friedemann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian P. Egan