This case was last updated from PACER on 08/11/2020 at 10:47:26 (UTC).

In Re: Boy Scouts of America et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 In Re Boy Scouts of America was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00798

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellant

Century Indemnity Company

Debtor

Boy Scouts of America et al

Appellees

Boy Scouts of America

Delaware BSA, LLC

Sidley Austin LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Derek C. Abbott

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Eric W. Moats

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew R. Remming

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Joseph Charles Barsalona, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Kevin Scott Mann

Attorney at Cross & Simon, LLC

1105 North Market Street, Suite 901

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher Page Simon

Attorney at Cross & Simon, LLC

1105 North Market Street, Suite 901

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER Granting #14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (*Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2020, Appellee Brief due by 9/30/2020, Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/14/2020) (see Footnote for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James W. Ducayet, Esq. and Robert N. Hochman, Esq. - filed by Sidley Austin LLP. (Simon, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Simon and Kevin Scott Mann on behalf of Sidley Austin LLP. (Mann, Kevin) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

18 #1

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

#18

(#18) Amended Notice of Appeal, Appealing the Order entered on 06/02/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343(LSS). Fee Status Paid - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#17

(#17) Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Stamatios Stamoulis, regarding requests for extension. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#16

(#16) DECLARATION of Jonathan Hacker re #15 Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Brief, by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#15

(#15) CONSENTED to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Appeal Brief - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

4 #5

Exhibit 05/29/2020 Transcript

4 #3

Exhibit 05/06/2020 Transcript

4 #1

Exhibit 04/15/2020 Transcript

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal, filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit , #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 6/26/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

1 #3

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #2

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Bench ruling

#1

(#1) Notice of Appeal, Appealing the Order entered on 06/02/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy Case Number 20-10343(LSS). *Fee Status Paid - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Bench Ruling, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORAL ORDER: The Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Appeal Brief (D.I. #15 ) is DISMISSED as moot. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Granting #14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (*Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 8/31/2020, Appellee Brief due by 9/30/2020, Appellant Reply Brief due by 10/14/2020) (see Footnote for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/22/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James W. Ducayet, Esq. and Robert N. Hochman, Esq., filed by Sidley Austin LLP. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/14/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James W. Ducayet, Esq. and Robert N. Hochman, Esq. - filed by Sidley Austin LLP. (Simon, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher P. Simon and Kevin Scott Mann on behalf of Sidley Austin LLP. (Mann, Kevin) Modified on 7/15/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Amended Notice of Appeal, Appealing the Order entered on 06/02/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343(LSS). Fee Status Paid - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(nmg) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Stamatios Stamoulis, regarding requests for extension. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DECLARATION of Jonathan Hacker re #15 Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Brief, by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENTED to Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Opening Appeal Brief - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Hacker - filed by Century Indemnity Company, Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLOCAL RULE 7.1.1 NOTICE: In accordance with Local Rule 7.1.1, except for civil cases involving pro se parties or motions brought by nonparties, every nondispositive motion shall be accompanied by an averment of counsel for the moving party that a reasonable effort has been made to reach agreement with the opposing party on the matters set forth in the motion. Unless otherwise ordered, failure to so aver may result in dismissal of the motion. The records of this case do not reflect such an averment by counsel for DI #5 . Please file the averment using the event code STATEMENT, found under OTHER DOCUMENTS. (nms) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Accept Documents Under Seal Into Appellate Record - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 6/26/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal, filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit , #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 6/26/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Friday, June 26, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/12/20. (cak) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (sam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNo Designation of Record Filed. (sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Appeal, Appealing the Order entered on 06/02/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy Case Number 20-10343(LSS). *Fee Status Paid - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Bench Ruling, #2 Order, #3 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sam) Modified on 6/17/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less