This case was last updated from PACER on 08/08/2020 at 11:25:38 (UTC).

IN RE: Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 IN RE Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00774

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellant

Century Indemnity Company

Appellees and Debtors

Boy Scouts of America

Delaware BSA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee and Debtor Attorneys

Derek C. Abbott

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Joseph Charles Barsalona, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Eric W. Moats

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew R. Remming

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) APPENDIX re #19 Appellant's Brief by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#19

(#19) Appellant's BRIEF by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss, filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#17

(#17) Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Abbott, Derek) Modified on 7/6/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

16 #1

Certificate of Compliance

#16

(#16) REPLY BRIEF re #4 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 7/7/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

15 #1

Exhibit A (Proposed Order)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moats, Eric) Modified on 7/2/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janine Panchok-Berry, Tancred Schiavoni, and Andrew Kirschenbaum - filed by Century Indemnity Company, Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

7 #2

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Katie Nownes re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal, by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Abbott, Derek) Modified on 6/23/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/6/2020. (Abbott, Derek) Modified on 6/23/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#16) REPLY BRIEF re #4 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 7/7/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

1 #2

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

1 #1

Order on Appeal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 05/26/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343(LSS). Fee Status Paid.- filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sam) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) APPENDIX re #19 Appellant's Brief by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Appellant's BRIEF by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss, filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/14/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: D.I. 16 has been corrected as it was filed using the incorrect code. The docket now reflects D.I. #16 is a Reply Brief in furtherance of the Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #4 ) and not Appellees' merit brief on appeal. (nms) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Abbott, Derek) Modified on 7/6/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY BRIEF re #4 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 7/7/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Answering Brief Deadline re #15 MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/16/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Stay Briefing Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moats, Eric) Modified on 7/2/2020 (nms). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janine Panchok-Berry, Tancred Schiavoni, and Andrew Kirschenbaum, filed by Century Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/1/2020. (nms) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Janine Panchok-Berry, Tancred Schiavoni, and Andrew Kirschenbaum - filed by Century Indemnity Company, Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DESIGNATION OF RECORD on Appeal, filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 6/23/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Katie Nownes re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal, by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Abbott, Derek) Modified on 6/23/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/6/2020. (Abbott, Derek) Modified on 6/23/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Interlocutory Appeal - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Abbott, Derek) Modified on 6/23/2020 (nms). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., Tuesday, June 23, 2020, the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/9/20. (cak) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (sam) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (sam) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (sam) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 05/26/2020 by Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343(LSS). Fee Status Paid.- filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order on Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal)(sam) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware BSA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Boy Scouts of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis