This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2020 at 08:31:45 (UTC).

In Re: Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 In Re Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00078

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Debtors

Delaware BSA, LLC

Boy Scouts of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Donna Lynn Culver

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Derek C. Abbott

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrew R. Remming

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Joseph Charles Barsalona, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph H. Lemkin - filed by R.L. and C.L. his wife. (Weaver, John) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#14

(#14) Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, dated 3/13/2020, from Amy C. Keller, Esq. on behalf of LG 37 Doe, regarding request for extension of time to obtain local counsel and respond to the Motion to Fix Venue on behalf of. (nms) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Raeann Warner on behalf of N. C., F. A., B. L., A. S., K. W., E. B., C. F. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION to File (I) Exhibit A to Debtors' Motion to Fix Venue and (II) The Declaration of Bruce A. Griggs Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/3/2020. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

(#9) REDACTED VERSION of #3 Exhibit to a Document by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Culver, Donna) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#8

(#16) ORAL ORDER: The motion to stay briefing (D.I. #8 ), which is unopposed, is GRANTED. Briefing on the motion to fix venue (D.I. #2 ) is STAYED indefinitely. The movant requested a status conference in its proposed order, but holding a status conference seems unnecessary at this time. If and when circumstances change, the interested parties should submit a joint status report with a request for whatever action they want me to take. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2020. (nms) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Adrian C. Azer re #2 MOTION to Fix Venue by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Brian Whittman re #2 MOTION to Fix Venue by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#4

(#4) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #2 MOTION to Fix Venue filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/17/2020. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#15) ORAL ORDER: LG 37 Doe is GRANTED a sixty (60) day extension of time to respond to the Motion to Fix Venue (D.I. #2 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/17/2020. (nms) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#1

(#12) ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION to File (I) Exhibit A to Debtors' Motion to Fix Venue and (II) The Declaration of Bruce A. Griggs Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/3/2020. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Joseph H. Lemkin for R.L. and C.L. his wife added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph H. Lemkin, filed by R.L. and C.L. his wife. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/16/2020. (nms) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph H. Lemkin - filed by R.L. and C.L. his wife. (Weaver, John) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORAL ORDER: The motion to stay briefing (D.I. #8 ), which is unopposed, is GRANTED. Briefing on the motion to fix venue (D.I. #2 ) is STAYED indefinitely. The movant requested a status conference in its proposed order, but holding a status conference seems unnecessary at this time. If and when circumstances change, the interested parties should submit a joint status report with a request for whatever action they want me to take. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/14/2020. (nms) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORAL ORDER: LG 37 Doe is GRANTED a sixty (60) day extension of time to respond to the Motion to Fix Venue (D.I. #2 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/17/2020. (nms) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter to the Honorable Richard G. Andrews, dated 3/13/2020, from Amy C. Keller, Esq. on behalf of LG 37 Doe, regarding request for extension of time to obtain local counsel and respond to the Motion to Fix Venue on behalf of. (nms) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Raeann Warner on behalf of N. C., F. A., B. L., A. S., K. W., E. B., C. F. (Warner, Raeann) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRemark: Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (nmg) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting D.I. #1 MOTION to File (I) Exhibit A to Debtors' Motion to Fix Venue and (II) The Declaration of Bruce A. Griggs Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/3/2020. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REDACTED VERSION of #3 Exhibit to a Document by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Culver, Donna) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketRemark: Exit Copies to Duty Judge (LPS). (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motion to Fix Venue - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) [SEALED] DECLARATION of Bruce A. Griggs re #2 MOTION to Change Venue by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Adrian C. Azer re #2 MOTION to Fix Venue by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Brian Whittman re #2 MOTION to Fix Venue by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #2 MOTION to Fix Venue filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/17/2020. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) [SEALED] EXHIBIT A re #2 MOTION to Fix Venue by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Fix Venue - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to File (I) Exhibit A to Debtors' Motion to Fix Venue and (II) The Declaration of Bruce A. Griggs Under Seal - filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (nmg) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware BSA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Boy Scouts of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph C. Barsalona Esq. II