This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2021 at 10:07:33 (UTC).

In re: Boy Scouts of America

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 In re Boy Scouts of America was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Appellant

Century Indemnity Company

Appellees and Debtors

Boy Scouts of America

Delaware BSA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee and Appellant Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Joseph Charles Barsalona, II

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Derek C. Abbott

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Eric W. Moats

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew R. Remming

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Paige Noelle Topper

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht and Tunnell

1201 N. Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899-1347

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/26/21. (cak) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

5 #4

Exhibit D

5 #3

Exhibit C

5 #2

Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) Additional Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a)(2), filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Moats, Eric) Modified on 1/4/2021 (nms). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankruptcy. P. 8009(a), filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 12/17/2020 (nms). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (kmd) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

1 #2

Transmittal

1 #1

Order

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL appealing the Order entered on 11/18/2020 by The Honorable Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343. (*Fee Status Paid) - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Transmittal)(kmd) Modified on 12/9/2020 (nms). (Entered: 12/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Recommendation that Bankruptcy Appeal be withdrawn from mandatory mediation. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/26/21. (cak) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Additional Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a)(2), filed by Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Moats, Eric) Modified on 1/4/2021 (nms). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankruptcy. P. 8009(a), filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 12/17/2020 (nms). (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#3) ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order dated September 11, 2012, regarding procedures to govern mediation of all appeals from the Bankruptcy Court which places such appeals in mandatory mediation; IT IS ORDERED that on or before 1/8/21 by 4:00 p.m., the parties shall advise in a joint written submission, no longer than three (3) pages in 12 point font, directed to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, their respective positions regarding mediation and reasoning for their positions, including whether the parties were previously or are presently involved in mediation or other ADR process. Should the parties jointly request the matter be removed from the mandatory mediation requirement, they are to provide a proposed briefing schedule and/or advise whether they feel a teleconference with a Magistrate Judge would be of assistance and why. This submission shall not be docketed, but shall be emailed to Judge Thynge, with a copy to Cathleen Kennedy, Judicial Administrator for Judge Thynge. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/4/20. (cak) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (kmd) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (kmd) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (kmd) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL appealing the Order entered on 11/18/2020 by The Honorable Laurie Selber Silverstein in Bankruptcy case number 20-10343. (*Fee Status Paid) - filed by Century Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Transmittal)(kmd) Modified on 12/9/2020 (nms). (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware BSA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Boy Scouts of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stamatios Stamoulis