This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 13:11:53 (UTC).

In re: Blackjewel L.L.C. and Cumberland River Coal L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 In re Blackjewel L L C and Cumberland River Coal L L C was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00866

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Appellant

United Bank

Debtor In Possession and Appellees

Revelation Management Corp.

Blackjewel L.L.C.

Dominion Coal Corporation

Powell Mountain Energy, LLC

Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC

Lone Mountain Processing, LLC

Vansant Coal Corporation

Cumberland River Coal LLC

Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC

Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C.

Revelation Energy, LLC

Interested Parties

Stephen G. Barker

James Pfeifer

Joseph Yoerg

Karen Ferris

Henry Looney

Whitney Kegley

Trustee

U. S. Trustee

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Peter J. Raupp

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

Joseph G. Bunn

Attorney at JONES & ASSOCIATES

P. O. Box 1989

Charleston, WV 25327

James E. McDaniel

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

C. Haley Bunn

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

Ancil G. Ramey

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 2195

Huntington, WV 25722-2195

Debtor In Possession and Appellee Attorneys

Felix Maximilian Czernin

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS

Suite 1900, 201 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Travis A. McRoberts

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS

Suite 1700, 2000 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Maura P. McIntyre

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS

4900 Key Tower, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Nava Hazan

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS

23Rd Floor, 30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112

Joe M. Supple

Attorney at SUPPLE LAW OFFICE

801 Viand Street

Point Pleasant, WV 25550

Stephen D. Lerner

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS

Suite 1900, 201 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Kyle F. Arendsen

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS

Suite 1900, 201 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Scott A. Kane

Attorney at SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS

Suite 1900, 201 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Steven L. Thomas

Attorney at KAY CASTO & CHANEY

P. O. Box 2031

Charleston, WV 25327-2031

Joseph W. Caldwell

Attorney at CALDWELL & RIFFEE

P. O. Box 4427

Charleston, WV 25364

Trustee Attorneys

David L. Bissett

Attorney at U.S. TRUSTEE'S OFFICE

Suite 2025, 300 Virginia Street East

Charleston, WV 25301

Gary O. Kinder

Attorney at UNITED STATES TRUSTEE'S OFFICE

Room 2025, 300 Virginia Street, East

Charleston, WV 25301

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

11 #9

Transmittal Sheet

11 #8

United Bank's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal

11 #7

Order Denying Motion for Stay Pending Appeal

11 #6

Motion for Expedited Consideration of United Bank's Motion to Stay Pending

11 #5

Objection to United Bank's Motion for Stay

11 #4

Amended AP Complaint

11 #3

Memorandum Order Denying United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection

11 #2

AP Complaint

11 #1

Voluntary Petition

#11

10 #22

Continuation

10 #21

Continuation

10 #15

Continuation

10 #2

Continuation

10 #1

Continuation

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF by United Bank. (Ramey, Ancil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPELLEES SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX RECORD by Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C., Blackjewel L.L.C., Cumberland River Coal LLC, Dominion Coal Corporation, Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC, Revelation Management Corp., Vansant Coal Corporation in support of #12 Appellees Brief. (Lerner, Stephen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPELLEES BRIEF by Blackjewel Holdings L.L.C., Blackjewel L.L.C., Cumberland River Coal LLC, Dominion Coal Corporation, Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC, Lone Mountain Processing, LLC, Powell Mountain Energy, LLC, Revelation Energy Holdings, LLC, Revelation Energy, LLC, Revelation Management Corp., Vansant Coal Corporation. Appellant Reply Brief due by 2/17/2021. (Lerner, Stephen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPELLEE DESIGNATIONS OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 1 volume. (Attachments: Main Document: Order Approving the Sale of Certain Assets #1 Voluntary Petition, #2 AP Complaint, #3 Memorandum Order Denying United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection, #4 Amended AP Complaint, #5 Objection to United Bank's Motion for Stay, #6 Motion for Expedited Consideration of United Bank's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, #7 Order Denying Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, #8 United Bank's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, #9 Transmittal Sheet) (mkw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONTINUATION OF APPELLANT DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 6 volumes. (Attachment: United Bank's Post-Hearing Reply Brief: #1 Continuation, #2 Continuation, #3 Continuation, #4 Continuation, #5 Continuation, #6 Continuation, #7 Continuation, #8 Continuation, #9 Continuation, #10 Continuation, #11 Continuation, #12 Continuation, #13 Continuation, #14 Continuation, #15 Continuation, #16 Continuation, #17 Continuation, #18 Continuation, #19 Continuation, #20 Continuation, #21 Continuation, #22 Continuation, #23 Continuation, #24 Continuation, #25 Continuation, #26 Continuation, #27 Continuation, #28 Continuation, #29 Continuation, #30 Continuation, #31 Continuation, #32 Continuation, #33 Continuation, #34 Continuation, #35 Continuation, #36 Continuation, #37 Continuation, #38 Continuation, #39 Continuation, #40 Continuation, #41 Continuation, #42 Continuation, #43 Continuation, #44 Continuation, #45 Continuation) (mkw) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONTINUATION OF APPELLANT DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 6 volumes. (Attachment: #1 Continuation U.S. Department of Labor's Emergency Motion to Halt the Transport and Transfer of Coal Located in Raven, Virginia and Honaker, VA) (mkw) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONTINUATION OF APPELLANT DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 6 volumes. (Attachments: #1 Transcript of Hearing before Bankruptcy Court on 9/4/2019, #2 Transcript of Hearing Held 6/24/2020, #3 Transcript of Hearing Trial Held 10/2/2019, #4 Transcript of Hearing Trial Held 9/5/2019, #5 U. S. Department of Labor's Emergency Motion to Halt the Transport and Transfer of Coal Located in Harlan County, Kentucky, #6 United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection, #7 United Bank's Post-Hearing Brief in Support of United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection) (mkw) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONTINUATION OF APPELLANT DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 6 volumes. (Attachments: #1 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, #2 Proof of Claim by Riverstone Credit Partners - Direct L.P., #3 Proof of Claim by United Bank, #4 Proof of Claim by United Bank, #5 Proposed Agreed Order Adjourning United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection, #6 proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #7 Reservation of Rights of United Bank, #8 Response Filed by Creditor Riverstone Credit Partners Direct L.P., #9 Response of the United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of the Interior, and Other Federal Governmental Creditors to United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection, #10 Transcript of Hearing before Bankruptcy Court on 1/22/2020) (mkw) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONTINUATION OF APPELLANT DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 6 volumes. (Attachments: #1 Debtors' Post Hearing Brief, #2 Debtors' Reply to United Bank's Post-Hearing Brief, #3 Motion of Debtors, #4 Notice by United States Trustee of Appointment of Creditors' Committee, #5 Notice of Appeal, #6 Order Approving the Sale of Certain Assets, #7 Order, #8 Order, #9 Order Granting Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code to Transfer Certain Eastern Permits and Reclamation Obligations to an Affiliate of FM Coal or its Designee) (mkw) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPELLANT DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL received from U. S. Bankruptcy Court in 6 volumes. (mkw) (Modified on 1/22/2021 to correct the filed date and to add additional attachments that were inadvertently omitted) (mkw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2021: #1 Declaration of Jeff A. Hoops, Sr., #2 Order Being Appealed, #3 Affidavit in support of BJMS' Joinder to Debtors' Motion, #4 Agreed Order Adjourning United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection, #5 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtors to Obtain Interim Junior Postpetition Financing from New DIP Lenders, #6 Debtors' Emergency Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtors to Obtain Interim Postpetition Financing from Riverstone Credit Partners, #7 Debtors' Emergency Motion, Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code, to Transfer Certain Eastern Permits and Reclamation Obligations to an Affiliate of FM Coal, LLC or its Designee, #8 Docket Card, #9 Transmittal Sheet) (mkw). (mkw). (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPELLANT'S BRIEF by United Bank. Appellee Brief due by 2/2/2021. (Ramey, Ancil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ancil G. Ramey on behalf of United Bank. (Ramey, Ancil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing that the appellant shall file its brief within fourteen days of the date of this order; the appellee's brief shall be filed within fourteen days after service of the appellant's brief; the appellant's reply brief shall be filed within fourteen days after service of the appellee's brief; the briefs shall not exceed 20 pages in length, double spaced, exclusive of pages containing the table of contents, table of citations, and any addendum containing statutes, rules, regulations, or similar material. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/4/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL AND TRANSMITTAL by United Bank; appeal from USBC/SDWV from the Memorandum Order entered 12/7/2020 entitled: Memorandum Order Denying United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Order Denying United Bank's Motion for Adequate Protection, #2 Clerk's Service of Notice of Appeal, and Notice to Designate the Record and Provide Statement of Issues on Appeal, #3 Docket Card, #4 Transmittal Sheet, #5 Corrected Transmittal Sheet) (mkw) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harold Keene Coal Co. LLC is a litigant