This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 11:40:53 (UTC).

In Re: Bernd Schaefers

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 In Re Bernd Schaefers was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Gary Klausner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06295

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

 

Party Details

Appellant and Debtor

Bernd Schaefers

Cambria, CA 93428

Appellee

Blizzard Energy, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorney

William C Beall

Attorney at Beall and Burkhardt APC

1114 State Street Suite 200

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: REQUEST for Relief AND Reconsideration #12 , for the following reasons: (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; (2) The relief Appellant requests must be sought by way of a properly noticed motion. (jp) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#12

(#12) REQUEST for Relief and for Reconsideration filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (jp) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING Response to Order to Show Cause and Designation of Record on Appeal submitted by Appellant Bernd Schaefers received on 8/18/2020 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) No copy provided for judge; (2) No proof of service attached to document(s); (3) Case closed on 8/18/2020 for lack of prosecution. (jp) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#10

(#10) (IN CHAMBERS) Order Dismissing Bankrupty Appeal by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby dismisses Appellant's Bankruptcy Appeal for lack of prosecution.. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). [Case Terminated. Made JS-6.] (et) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#9

(#9) DESIGNATION OF RECORD filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (et) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#8

(#8) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Appellant to show cause in writing on or before 8/14/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#7

(#7) APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE TO USDC. (et) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding It appears that Appellant has failed to: Pay the filing fee (28 U.S.C. 1930(b) and (c). Fees must be submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Central District of California, within 14 days from the notice issued by the Bankruptcy Clerk. forwarded to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Appeal filing fee was not paid forwarded to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 7/15/2020. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #1

USBC Docket

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY UNDER 11 U.S.C. 362 entered on 7/2/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Martin R Barash, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 7/15/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 9:19-bk-11163-MB, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: REQUEST for Relief AND Reconsideration #12 , for the following reasons: (1) Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; (2) The relief Appellant requests must be sought by way of a properly noticed motion. (jp) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST for Relief and for Reconsideration filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (jp) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner, ORDERING Response to Order to Show Cause and Designation of Record on Appeal submitted by Appellant Bernd Schaefers received on 8/18/2020 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) No copy provided for judge; (2) No proof of service attached to document(s); (3) Case closed on 8/18/2020 for lack of prosecution. (jp) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) (IN CHAMBERS) Order Dismissing Bankrupty Appeal by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby dismisses Appellant's Bankruptcy Appeal for lack of prosecution.. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). [Case Terminated. Made JS-6.] (et) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DESIGNATION OF RECORD filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (et) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Appellant to show cause in writing on or before 8/14/2020 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEAL DEFICIENCY NOTICE TO USDC. (et) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding It appears that Appellant has failed to: Pay the filing fee (28 U.S.C. 1930(b) and (c). Fees must be submitted to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Central District of California, within 14 days from the notice issued by the Bankruptcy Clerk. forwarded to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Notice of Appeal filing fee was not paid forwarded to Judge R. Gary Klausner. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF APPEAL (ADVERSARY) prepared by the United States Bankruptcy Court on 7/15/2020. (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL: Re: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY UNDER 11 U.S.C. 362 entered on 7/2/2020 by Bankruptcy Judge Martin R Barash, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 7/15/2020. Bankruptcy Court case number: 9:19-bk-11163-MB, Adversary number: NONE, BAP case number: NONE, filed by Appellant Bernd Schaefers. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket) (car) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less