This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2022 at 06:04:35 (UTC).

In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 In Re Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen McMahon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02334

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Appellants

Randy Epstein Austin

Jane Epstein

Susan Epstein Gross

Muriel Epstein

Estate of Seymour Epstein

In Re and Debtor

Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Appellee

Irving H. Picard

Intervenor

SIPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Helen Davis Chaitman

Appellee Attorneys

David J. Sheehan

Nicholas J. Cremona

Seanna R. Brown

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal

Intervenor Attorneys

Nathanael Stephen Kelley

Kenneth J. Caputo

Kevin H. Bell

 

Court Documents

40 #1

Exhibit Decision and Order, and Judgment

40 #40

Main Document

39 #1

Right to Appeal

39 #39

Main Document

#38

(#38) DECISION AND ORDER ON APPEAL: For the foregoing reasons, the Trustee's motion for summary judgment is granted in favor of the Trustee. The Clerk of this Court is directed to enter judgment as follows: The Epstein Judgment: $1,110,538.16 against the Estate of Seymour Epstein and Muriel Epstein as Executrix of the Seymour Estate and Trustee of the Trusts created by the Last Will and Testament of Seymour Epstein, plus prejudgment interest at a rate of 4% from November 30, 2010 through the date of this order. The Shelburne Judgment: $1,511,900.39 against Shelburne Shirt Company, Inc., plus prejudgment interest at a rate of 4% from November 30, 2010 through the date of this order. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. This is a written opinion. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/17/2022) BY ECF TO ALL PARTIES (kv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#37

(#37) LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Helen Davis Chaitman dated November 18, 2021 re: Trustee's letter dated November 16, 2021. Document filed by Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#36

(#36) LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Seanna R. Brown dated November 16, 2021 re: Appeal of Opinion and Order in Picard v. JABA Assocs., No. 20 cv. 3836 (JGK). Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#35

(#35) SECOND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellants Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross..(bkar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#34

#33

#32

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #40 Notice of Appeal, filed by Estate of Seymour Epstein, Jane Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross, Randy Epstein Austin, Muriel Epstein were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #40 Notice of Appeal. (tp) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF APPEAL from #38 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #39 Clerk's Judgment,,,,. Document filed by Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-25866587. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision and Order, and Judgment).(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #38 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Irving H. Picard against Estate of Seymour Epstein, Muriel Epstein, in the amount of $1,609,154.58; in favor of Irving H. Picard against Estate of Seymour Epstein in the amount of $2,190,722.95. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Decision and Order on Appeal dated February 17, 2022, the Trustee's motion for summary judgment is granted in favor of the Trustee. Judgment is entered as follows: The Epstein Judgment: $1,110,538.16 against the Estate of Seymour Epstein and Muriel Epstein as Executrix of the Seymour Estate and Trustee of the Trusts created by the Last Will and Testament of Seymour Epstein, plus prejudgment interest at a rate of 4% from November 30, 2010 through the date of the order, in the amount of $498,616.42. The Shelburne Judgment: $1,511,900.39 against Shelburne Shirt Company, Inc., plus prejudgment interest at a rate of 4% from November 30, 2010 through the date of the order, in the amount of $678,822.56. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/17/2022) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) DECISION AND ORDER ON APPEAL: For the foregoing reasons, the Trustee's motion for summary judgment is granted in favor of the Trustee. The Clerk of this Court is directed to enter judgment as follows: The Epstein Judgment: $1,110,538.16 against the Estate of Seymour Epstein and Muriel Epstein as Executrix of the Seymour Estate and Trustee of the Trusts created by the Last Will and Testament of Seymour Epstein, plus prejudgment interest at a rate of 4% from November 30, 2010 through the date of this order. The Shelburne Judgment: $1,511,900.39 against Shelburne Shirt Company, Inc., plus prejudgment interest at a rate of 4% from November 30, 2010 through the date of this order. This constitutes the decision and order of the court. This is a written opinion. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/17/2022) BY ECF TO ALL PARTIES (kv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Helen Davis Chaitman dated November 18, 2021 re: Trustee's letter dated November 16, 2021. Document filed by Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Seanna R. Brown dated November 16, 2021 re: Appeal of Opinion and Order in Picard v. JABA Assocs., No. 20 cv. 3836 (JGK). Document filed by Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) SECOND AMENDED DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellants Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross..(bkar) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #32 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Great. Thank you. File a 30 page brief. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/7/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Helen Davis Chaitman dated 04/15/2021 re: Briefing schedule. Document filed by Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross..(Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Vanderwal, Amy) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seanna R. Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard..(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellants Randy Epstein Austin, Jane Epstein, Muriel Epstein, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Susan Epstein Gross. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Issues)(bkar) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Katherine Polk Failla is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (bkar) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Judgment of Judge Cecelia G. Morris dated February 4, 2021. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-4438A, 08-1789 (CGM). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Susan Epstein Gross, Estate of Seymour Epstein, Jane Epstein, Randy Epstein Austin, Muriel Epstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(bkar) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less